Stanley v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: John T. Stanley
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00111
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-01834, filed 03/16/2020. (jmb)
March 12, 2020 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2741 Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Vince Chhabria, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #193. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2741 Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Vince Chhabria, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John T. Stanley. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Kenny, Michael)
February 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk notes attorney Michael P. Kenny's e-mail address in CM/ECF is listed as mpkennyesq@msn.com. However, the Clerk noted in the Complaint his e-mail address is listed as mpkenny@kenny-kenny.com. The Clerk contacted the firm and they advised that he receives e-mails at both addresses and does not need to be updated at this time. (kmp)
February 4, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Does 1-10 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on "John Does 1-10" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain the defendants identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of "John Does 1-10" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (kmp)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (kmp)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company and John Does 1-10 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5017216) filed by John T. Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Stanley
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?