Guyette et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Guyette and Shelley Guyette
Defendant: Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 5:2020cv00261
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kabbash, Maha)
March 9, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
March 9, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
March 9, 2020 Filing 50 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/20/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copies served upon Attorneys' electronically} (jmb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney William M. Gage, Esq., Ashley Nader Stubbs, Esq., Paul Stokely Rosenblatt, Esq., and Kari L. Sutherland, Esq., Email addresses are: william.gage@butlersnow.com, ashley.stubbs@butlersnow.com, paul.rosenblatt@butlersnow.com and kari.sutherland@butlersnow.com. Phone numbers are: 601-985-4561, 601-985-4572, 601-985-4596 and 901-680-7354. Admissions due by 3/23/2020. Copy of Notice sent to Attorneys electronically} (jmb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Susan M. Robinson, Esq., Email address is srobinson@tcspllc.com. Phone number is 304-414-1800. Admissions due by 3/23/2020. {Copy of Notice sent to Attorney electronically} (jmb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Molly E. Flynn, Esq., Email address is molly.flynn@faegredrinker.com. Phone number is 215-988-2700. Admissions due by 3/23/2020. {Copy of Notice sent to Attorney electronically} (jmb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiffs'; Attorneys' Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., Michelle L. Tiger, Esq., and Priscilla E. Jimenez, Esq., Email addresses are: Lee.Balefsky@Klinespecter.com; mtiger@youmancaputo.com; and priscilla.jimenez@klinespecter.com. Phone number is 215-772-1000. Admissions due by 3/23/2020. {Copies of Notice sent to the attorneys electronically} (jmb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-00702. electronically transferred when case opened
February 28, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) Pls Mem in Support of Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) Defs Resp to Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Prior Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr.)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3671) Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3675) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3784) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3863) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6862) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6967) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7117) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 42 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 41 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 40 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2050) Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2051) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2159) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2230) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6798) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7019) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7440) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 39 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 38 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 37 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 36 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 35 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/20/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Shelley Guyette, Raymond Guyette (Balefsky, Lee) (Modified on 5/1/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 27 OPPOSITION by Raymond Guyette, Shelley Guyette to #25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Issuing Subpoena to Dr. Nanci Hawkins by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Nanci Hawkins on 10/18/2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Extension of Discovery Deadline to Take Implanting Physician's Deposition Due to Misidentification of Implanting Physician in Medical Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Shelley Guyette, Raymond Guyette (Stubbs, Ashley) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to add party filers)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Issuing Subpoena to Dr. Adedayo Onibokun by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Adedayo Onibokun on 9/28/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Issuing Subpoena to Dr. Adedayo Onibokun by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Adedayo Onibokun on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Shelly Guyette on 5/18/2018 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Paul Stokely Rosenblatt on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Ashley Nader Stubbs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Stubbs, Ashley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Nanci Hawkins on 3/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Raymond Guyette, Shelley Guyette. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 6, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 1, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
January 16, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 160 (Order Scheduling Meetings in MDLs on January 29-30, 2015) entered on 12/18/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
January 15, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3635981. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyette et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Guyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Guyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?