Me v. ITW Building Components Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ja Me
Defendant: S.R. Sloan, Inc., Alpine Engineered Products, Inc. and ITW Building Components Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00308
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/14/2020. Appearances: Robert Dwyer, Esq. for Plaintiff; Kurt Rozelsky, Esq. for Defendants. Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures completed. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Plaintiff to file request for jury trial by 5/22/2020. Stipulated protective order to be submitted for Court approval by 5/29/2020. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (Court Reporter Hannah Cavanaugh) (sg)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ja Me. (Dwyer, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Letter Request to reschedule the telephone Rule 16 Conference: The Telephone Initial Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 5/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Counsel previously were provided with the call-in information. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/11/2020. (sg )
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Counsel Kurt Rozelsky re Rule 16 Conference for Alpine Engineered Products, Inc., ITW Building Components Group, Inc. requesting Rule 16 Conference Continuance submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Rozelsky, Kurt)
May 7, 2020 TEXT NOTICE RE: 5/12/2020 10:30am Telephone R. 16 Conference: Counsel are directed to call in to the following number: 1-888-684-8852, Access Code 7855922, Security Code 78463. Please follow the prompts/instructions when making this call. (sg )
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Alpine Engineered Products, Inc., ITW Building Components Group, Inc.. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Alpine Engineered Products, Inc., ITW Building Components Group, Inc. Substitution of Counsel (Rozelsky, Kurt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alpine Engineered Products, Inc., ITW Building Components Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Illinois Tool Works Inc. for Alpine Engineered Products, Inc., ITW Building Components Group, Inc... (Rozelsky, Kurt)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement; Attorney Ken Abell, Email address is kabell@abramslaw.com. Phone number is 516-328-2300. Admissions due by 4/3/2020. {Clerk served Notice upon Attorney Abell via e-mail}(pjh, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/5/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Alpine Engineered Products, Inc. and ITW Building Components Group, Inc. (pjh, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Alpine Engineered Products, Inc. and ITW Building Components Group, Inc. State Court Case Number: 002942-2019. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Case Number: 009504/2018) {Clerk was informed by Attorney Kurt Matthew Rozelsky that the Complaint from 009504/2018 was filed, but never served on the defendants prompting the second Complaint to be filed under case number 002942/2019}.(pjh, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 002942/2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5065222) filed by Alpine Engineered Products, Inc. and ITW Building Components Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint Case Number: 009504/2018, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service of S.R. Sloan, Inc., #3 Affidavit of Service Alpine Engineered Products, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Alternate Dispute Resolution Determination and Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Stipulation and Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Complaint Case Number: 002942/2019, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Me v. ITW Building Components Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.R. Sloan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Engineered Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Rozelsky
Represented By: Bryan D. Cross
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Represented By: Duwaine T. Bascoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITW Building Components Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Rozelsky
Represented By: Bryan D. Cross
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Represented By: Duwaine T. Bascoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ja Me
Represented By: Robert P. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?