Kline v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jeffery A. Kline
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00339
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Troisi on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Troisi, Michael)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Wagner, Mark)
April 17, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 4/29/2020. (jel, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and General Order 25 served on State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 04/08/2020, filed by Jeffery A. Kline. (Shannon, Kelsey)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/17/2020. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (mgh)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5070314) filed by Jeffery A. Kline. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery A. Kline
Represented By: Kelsey W. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark J. Wagner, Jr.
Represented By: Michael A Troisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?