Joell v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Lionel Joell
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Case Number: 5:2020cv00689
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emer M. Stack on behalf of Ryan D. McCarthy (Stack, Emer)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, GO 25 and Civil Cover Sheet served on U.S. Attorney General on 06/22/2020, filed by Lionel Joell. (Whitaker, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, GO 25 and Civil Cover Sheet served on U.S. Attorney General for the Northern District of New York on 06/22/2020, filed by Lionel Joell. (Whitaker, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, GO 25 and Civil Cover Sheet served on Ryan D. McCarthy as Secretary of the Army on 06/22/2020, filed by Lionel Joell. (Whitaker, Robert)
June 26, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Ryan D. McCarthy answer due 8/24/2020. (mgh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/14/2020.All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618(a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ryan D. McCarthy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the United States Attorney's Office, #2 Summons Issued as to the United States Attorney General)(mgh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan D. McCarthy (Filing fee $400 receipt number 5148826) filed by Lionel Joell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joell v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Joell
Represented By: Robert C. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Represented By: Emer M. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?