Blount v. County of Onondaga et al
Plaintiff: Sayvion D. Blount
Defendant: County of Onondaga, Janelle N. Ecker, City of Syracuse, Timothy Roulan, Hon. Mary Anne Doherty and Joseph Centra
Case Number: 5:2020cv00937
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Court has received plaintiff's letter motion (Dkt. No. #6 ) seeking to amend the complaint and requesting appointment of counsel. The complaint is currently under review by the Court for sufficiency pursuant to 28 USC Section 1915. The Court will consider the amended statement of facts (Dkt. No. 6 at pp. 2-3), and plaintiff's request for counsel when reviewing the complaint. The Court will issue a decision on the review pursuant to 28 USC Section 1915 in due course. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/2/2020. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.)(sg )
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Letter Motion for Sayvion D. Blount requesting leave to amend complaint and appointment of counsel submitted to Judge Dancks. (dpk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sayvion D. Blount. Effective Date 8/31/2020. Old Address: Onondaga County Correctional Facility, 6660 E. Seneca Turnpike, Jamesville, NY 13078. New Address: Downstate Correctional Facility, Box F, Red Schoolhouse Road, Fishkill, NY 12524. (dpk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS: Filed by Sayvion D. Blount with his Complaint advising that he is at the Onondaga County Correctional Facility in Jamesville, NY. (rep)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Sayvion D. Blount. (rep)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Sayvion D. Blount. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (rep)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Joseph Centra, City of Syracuse, County of Onondaga, Mary Anne Doherty, Janelle N. Ecker, and Timothy Roulan. Filed by Sayvion D. Blount. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount v. County of Onondaga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Onondaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle N. Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Roulan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Mary Anne Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Centra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayvion D. Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?