Thompson v. Metrodata Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas Jon Thompson
Defendant: Metrodata Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01213
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Letter Request to file a stipulation of dismissal by 1/19/2021, as the parties have reached a confidential settlement in principle.. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 11/19/2020. (bjw, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle by Nicholas Jon Thompson (Singer, Adam)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Letter Request for extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Metrodata Services, Inc. answer due 11/18/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/19/2020. (sg )
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Richard A. Braden, Esq. for Metrodata Services, Inc. requesting an order extending defendant's time to file a response to plaintiff's complaint. submitted to Judge Therese W. Dancks . (Braden, Richard)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Braden on behalf of Metrodata Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation)(Braden, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicholas Jon Thompson re #1 Complaint, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, Docket #3 Filing Order, and Docket #1 Complaint, Served upon Defendant (Singer, Adam)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Jon Thompson. Metrodata Services, Inc. served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Singer, Adam)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 1/4/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/28/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Metrodata Services, Inc. (map)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Metrodata Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5265399) filed by Nicholas Jon Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Metrodata Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Jon Thompson
Represented By: Adam G. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrodata Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?