Slater v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Carl L. Slater
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 5:2020cv01421
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:21-cv-00312, filed 01/07/2021. (plp)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #240. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 6, 2021 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER dated 12/11/20 from law firm regarding Notice of Related Cases regarding MDL transfer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmc)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/1/2020. (jel, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 2:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/10/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmc)
November 19, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 Request for Waiver of Service. Clerk inadvertently filed #2 with the incorrect date. Clerk corrected the date to reflect the date of filing. (kmc)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Johnson & Johnson and Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. on 11/18/2020 by Carl L. Slater. (kmc) Modified on 11/19/2020 to correct filing date. (kmc)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5321840) filed by Carl L. Slater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L. Slater
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?