Allstate Indemnity Company v. Spectrum Northeast, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Spectrum Northeast, LLC and Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation doing business as National Grid
Cross Defendant: Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv00222
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spectrum Northeast, LLC. (Masino, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Spectrum Northeast, LLC by Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(McHugh, Timothy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Grid, USA for Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation.. (McHugh, Timothy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. McHugh on behalf of Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation (McHugh, Timothy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation by Spectrum Northeast, LLC.(Masino, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed status report (Dkt. No. #11 ) and appreciates the information provided. All defendants to file a response to the complaint by 4/26/2021 per Dkt. No. 10 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/15/2021. (sg)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT/Letter Request Defendant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation d/b/a National Grid response to Complaint by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Luccaro, Daniel) Modified on 4/14/2021 (sg, ).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the #9 Stipulation for extension. The Court notes that the defendants' answer deadline has passed and no good cause reason is given in the stipulation for the requested extension. Stipulation for extension approved. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions of deadlines must be made before the relevant deadline expires and must state a good cause reason for the extension, even if the parties agree. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/26/2021. Telephone Rule 16 Conference and related deadlines remain as set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/6/2021. (sg)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Spectrum Northeast, LLC. (Masino, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Masino on behalf of Spectrum Northeast, LLC (Masino, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure and G.O. Filing Order 25 served on Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation on March 5, 2021, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Coffey, Daniel)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure and G.O. Filing Order 25 served on Spectrum Northeast, LLC on March 5, 2021, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Coffey, Daniel)
March 12, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation answer due 3/26/2021; Spectrum Northeast, LLC answer due 3/26/2021. (hmr)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (hmr)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Company. (hmr)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/25/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Spectrum Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation d/b/a National Grid)(hmr)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Spectrum Northeast, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5437688) filed byAllstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Spectrum Northeast, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Daniel W. Coffey
Represented By: Daniel J. Luccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Northeast, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Masino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation doing business as National Grid
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?