Allstate Indemnity Company v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Terence P. O'Connor
Case Number: 5:2021cv00245
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle N. Kordich on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Kordich, Kyle)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Terrence P. O'Connor has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Erin Mead, Esq. and Dennis Murphy, Esq. and. Dated: 4/19/2021(Thorn, Arthur)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 4/20/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/9/2021. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/2/2021. (nmk)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 6/17/2021. Discovery cutoff is 2/3/2022 (plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 11/5/2021; defendants' expert disclosures due by 12/20/2021; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 1/4/2021). Dispositive motions to be filed by 4/4/2022. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/2/2021. (nmk)
April 2, 2021 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter Access Code 3362194 to connect to the conference. (nmk)
April 2, 2021 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 4/2/2021 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel. The parties agreed to try to exchange additional information regarding the cordless drill involved and facilitating a joint inspection of the product. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of Senior Judge Scullin. A follow-up telephonic status conference is set for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 AM. Appearances: Dennis Murphy, Esq. for plaintiff; Erin Mead, Esq. and Arthur Thorn, Esq. for defendant. Time: 10:05 AM - 10:23 AM. (nmk)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN entered into 3/24/21 by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Mead, Erin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Murphy on behalf of Allstate Indemnity Company (Murphy, Dennis)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #7 Answer to Complaint w/Demand for Jury Trial served on plaintiff via USPS by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Mead, Erin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on plaintiff via USPS by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Mead, Erin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Mead, Erin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Demand for Jury Trial)(Mead, Erin)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur H. Thorn on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Thorn, Arthur)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for notice of filing of removal and notice of removal served on plaintiff's counsel on 3/3/21, filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Mead, Erin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Joel S. Stuttman, The Stuttman Law Group, P.C., 709 Westchester Ave., Suite 300, White Plains, NY 10604,,. Phone number is 914-948-8392. Admissions due by 3/17/2021. (khr)(Notice was mailed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2021 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
March 3, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. answer due 3/9/2021. (khr)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (khr)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Onondaga, case number 008757/2020 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5442473) filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Dennis Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: Erin P. Mead
Represented By: Kyle N. Kordich
Represented By: Arthur H. Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Terence P. O'Connor
Represented By: Terence P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?