Bledsoe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tonya Bledsoe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00787
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court has considered Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in this matter under 28 USC 1915. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/3/2021. (mab)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (dpk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Tonya Bledsoe advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Olinsky, Howard)
July 14, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY - The Clerk has amended the case filed date as well as the filed dates for documents #1 through #4 to reflect that the case was filed on July 9, 2021 rather than July 12, 2021. (dpk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hugh Rappaport appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/12/2021. (Rappaport, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bledsoe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Bledsoe
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Hugh Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?