Beckwith v. The City of Syracuse et al
Plaintiff: Davonne Beckwith
Defendant: The City of Syracuse, Detective Terell Irvine and Patrol Officer Jacob Breen
Case Number: 5:2021cv00809
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Text Only Order - On August 25, 2021, defendants moved to dismiss the complaint. (Dkt. No. 6.) On September 8, 2021, as a matter of right, plaintiff amended the complaint. (Dkt. No. 9.) Defendants' motion to dismiss, (Dkt. No. 6), is DENIED as moot. On September 9, 2021, defendants filed a letter requesting an extension of time until October 8, 2021, with consent of plaintiff, to respond to the amended complaint. (Dkt. No. 10.) Defendants request for an extension of time until October 8, 2021 to respond to the amended complaint, (Dkt. No. 10), is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/10/2021. (jel, )
September 10, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Jacob Breen answer due 10/8/2021; Terell Irvine answer due 10/8/2021; The City of Syracuse answer due 10/8/2021. (jel, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER BRIEF Requesting 30-Day Extension by Jacob Breen, Terell Irvine, The City of Syracuse. (Blood, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT as permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) in response to Defendants' 12(b)(6) motion against All Defendants filed by Davonne Beckwith.(Sivin, Edward)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of the #6 Motion to Dismiss, the 10/26/2021 Rule 16 Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned without new date at this time. The conference will be rescheduled, as necessary, once a decision on the Motion to Dismiss has been issued by the District Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/30/2021. (sg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Long on behalf of Jacob Breen, Terell Irvine, The City of Syracuse (Long, Todd)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jacob Breen, Terell Irvine, The City of Syracuse. Response to Motion due by 9/15/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Attorney Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Fourth Department Decision and Order) (Blood, Patrick)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on The City of Syracuse, Detective Terell Irvine, and Patrol Officer Jacob Breen on 08/04/2021, filed by Davonne Beckwith. (Rastetter, Clyde)
August 6, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Jacob Breen answer due 8/25/2021; Terell Irvine answer due 8/25/2021; The City of Syracuse answer due 8/25/2021. (mgh)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clyde Rastetter on behalf of Davonne Beckwith (Rastetter, Clyde)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2021 10:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/19/2021. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call.(Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jacob Breen, Terell Irvine, The City of Syracuse. (mgh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacob Breen, Terell Irvine, The City of Syracuse (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-551243) filed by Davonne Beckwith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckwith v. The City of Syracuse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davonne Beckwith
Represented By: Edward Sivin
Represented By: Clyde Rastetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Syracuse
Represented By: Todd M. Long
Represented By: Patrick R. Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Terell Irvine
Represented By: Todd M. Long
Represented By: Patrick R. Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrol Officer Jacob Breen
Represented By: Todd M. Long
Represented By: Patrick R. Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?