New Hope Family Services, Inc. v. James et al
Plaintiff: New Hope Family Services, Inc.
Defendant: Letitia James, Licha Nyiendo, Melissa Franco, Gina Martinez, Julia Day and William Fitzpatrick
Case Number: 5:2021cv01031
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: In light of the pending motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. #31 ) and the anticipated cross-motion of defendants to dismiss (see Text Minute Entry 10/25/2021), the Rule 16 conference and related deadlines are adjourned and will be reset as necessary in the future. While the dates for defendants Nyiendo, Franco, Martinez, and Day to respond to the complaint have passed, for clarification the Court sets the time for all defendants to respond to the complaint to the date the cross-motion to dismiss is due which, per Dkt. No. 31, is 11/16/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/4/2021. (sg)
October 27, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE by William Fitzpatrick that William Fitzpatrick does not intend to oppose the motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 31) filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc. (Heisler, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 11/16/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) 1- Lippelmann Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) 2- Geyer Affidavit, #4 Exhibit(s) 3- Jerman Affidavit, #5 Exhibit(s) 4- Loscombe Affidavit, #6 Exhibit(s) 5- E. Bleuer Affidavit, #7 Exhibit(s) 6- Stultz Affidavit, #8 Exhibit(s) 7- Johnston Affidavit, #9 Exhibit(s) 8- J. Bleuer Affidavit, #10 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 25, 2021 TEXT Minute Entry for Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/25/2021 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Roger Brooks, Esq. and Mark Lippelmann, Esq. for the Plaintiff; Adrienne Kerwin, AAG for NYS Defendants; John Heisler, Jr., Esq. for defendant Fitzpatrick; Judge D'Agostino addresses the pre-motion letters filed by the plaintiff and NYS Defendants; Counsel address the Court with their justifications for making motions at this stage of the case - after hearing from counsel, Judge D'Agostino will permit the Plaintiff's to file their motion for injunctive relief. The plaintiff's motion will be filed this week; The NYS defendants will cross-move to dismiss; Defendant Fitzpatrick has already filed an answer to the complaint, and does not intend to make any motions at this time; The Motion will be expedited, if possible. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson,CRD Britney Norton [Time 11:00/11:15 a.m. - 11:28 a.m.]) (ban)
October 22, 2021 Filing 30 Pre-Motion Response to #28 Pre-Motion Letter by Julia Day, Melissa Franco, Letitia James, Gina Martinez, Licha Nyiendo requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Brooks, Roger)
October 21, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Cortman on behalf of New Hope Family Services, Inc. (Cortman, David)
October 19, 2021 Filing 28 Pre-Motion Letter by Julia Day, Melissa Franco, Letitia James, Gina Martinez, Licha Nyiendo requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 10/22/2021 (Kerwin, Adrienne)
October 19, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Melissa Franco answer due 11/2/2021; Gina Martinez answer due 11/2/2021; Licha Nyiendo answer due 11/2/2021. (ztc, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Court Notice served on Melissa Franco on 10/12/21, filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 18, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Court Notice served on Licha Nyiendo on 10/12/21, filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 18, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Court Notice served on Gina Martinez on 10/12/21, filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 18, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Julia Day answer due 10/27/2021. (ztc, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Court Notice served on Julia Day on 10/06/21, filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 Pre-Motion Letter by New Hope Family Services, Inc. requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 10/20/2021 (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed letter motion (Dkt. No. #20 ) requesting an extension of time for defendant James to respond to the complaint which is granted as follows: defendant James' response to the complaint is due 11/15/2021. Plaintiff is directed to file affidavits of service for defendants Nyiendo, Martinez, and Day by 10/20/2021 if they have already been served, and if not, then within seven (7) days of effectuating service on those defendants. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/15/2021. (sg)
October 15, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William Fitzpatrick.(Heisler, John)
October 15, 2021 Filing 20 Letter Motion from Adrienne J. Kerwin for Letitia James requesting extension of time to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Dancks . (Kerwin, Adrienne)
October 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Heisler, Jr on behalf of William Fitzpatrick (Heisler, John)
October 6, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re Set/Reset Answer Deadline, Clerk inadvertently set the Answer deadline for 10/27/2021 for Def. Letitia James. The correct answer deadline is 10/15/2021. (ztc, )
October 6, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for William Fitzpatrick answer due 10/15/2021; Letitia James answer due 10/15/2021. (ztc, )
October 6, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Letitia James answer due 10/27/2021. (ztc, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Court Notice served on William Fitzpatrick on 09/24/2021, filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Court Notice served on Letitia James on 09/24/2021, filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc.. (Lippelmann, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah Galus on behalf of New Hope Family Services, Inc. (Galus, Jeremiah)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremiah Galus, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/4/2021. (sg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Greenwood Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Roger)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremiah Galus Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5661943. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Scruggs, Jonathan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Lippelmann on behalf of New Hope Family Services, Inc. (Lippelmann, Mark)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Lippelmann, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/27/2021. (sg)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Lippelmann Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5660222. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Scruggs, Jonathan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/20/21. (ban)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party New Hope Family Services, Inc.; Attorney Jeremiah Galus, Esq., Email address is jgalus@ADFlegal.org. Phone number is (480) 444-0020. Admissions due by 10/4/2021. (ztc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party New Hope Family Services, Inc.; Attorney Mark Lippelmann, Esq., Email address is mlippelmann@adflegal.org. Phone number is (480) 444-0020. Admissions due by 10/4/2021. (ztc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party New Hope Family Services, Inc.; Attorney Roger Brooks, Esq., Email address is rbrooks@adflegal.org. Phone number is (480) 444-0020. Admissions due by 10/4/2021. (ztc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (ztc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/20/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/13/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Letitia James. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Licha Nyiendo, #2 Summons issued as to Melissa Franco, #3 Summons Issued as to Gina Martinez, #4 Summons issued as to Julia Day, #5 Summons issued as to William Fitzpatrick)(ztc, )
September 20, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 5:18-cv-01419. (ztc, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Hope Family Services, Inc. (ztc, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Letitia James, Licha Nyiendo, Melissa Franco, Gina Martinez, Julia Day, and William Fitzpatrick.(Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5651934) filed by New Hope Family Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hope Family Services, Inc. v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hope Family Services, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Represented By: Jonathan A. Scruggs
Represented By: Roger Greenwood Brooks
Represented By: Jeremiah Galus
Represented By: Mark Lippelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Licha Nyiendo
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Franco
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Martinez
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Day
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fitzpatrick
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?