Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tyler James Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv01216
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (ds)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (ds)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Tyler James Harris advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ds)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE NOTICE signed by the Plaintiff on 11/16/2021. (ds)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security re 6 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner (Stewart, Amelia)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amelia Stewart appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 2/15/2022. (Stewart, Amelia)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Tyler James Harris: The Court having considered Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (Dkt. No. #2 ), it is hereby ORDERED, that the application is GRANTED. **Plaintiff should note that, although the application to proceed in forma pauperis has been granted, Plaintiff will still be required to pay fees that Plaintiff incurs in this action, including copying and/or witness fees. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/10/2021. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.) (sg)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 12/1/2021. (gmd, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK, LOCAL RULES, and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed (gmd, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tyler James Harris (gmd, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler James Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Amelia Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?