Nieves v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Ailed Nieves
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv01294
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ailed Nieves. (Wnek, Jill)
January 31, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Boston Scientific Corporation answer due 2/28/2022. (egr)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/9/2021. (jdp )
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Fatima Abuzerr Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5736277. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Fatima Abuzerr Petition for Admission, #2 Notice of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney Registration & Oath, #5 6. Declaration of Sponsor - Executed, #6 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Wnek, Jill)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Ailed Nieves; Attorney Fatima Abuzerr, Esq. and Ken Moll, Esq., Email address is fabuzerr@molllawgroup.com and kmoll@molllawgroup.com. Physical address is 22 W. Washington St., Chicago, Il 60602. Phone number is (312) 462-1700. Case assignment clerk emailed and mailed attorneys. Admissions due by 12/17/2021. (egr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/2/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/23/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (egr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Boston Scientific Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5732269) filed by Ailed Nieves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr) Modified on 12/6/2021 to reflect correct filing date (egr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieves v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ailed Nieves
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Represented By: Jill Wnek
Represented By: Ken Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?