Anderson v. Friendly Ford of Hamilton, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: George Anderson
Defendant: Friendly Ford of Hamilton, Inc. and Sidney Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2022cv00545
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sidney Federal Credit Union. Motion returnable before Judge ML Response to Motion due by 8/8/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification of Service, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Siachos, Peter)
June 28, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Sidney Federal Credit Union answer due 7/18/2022. (ban)
June 28, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Sidney Federal Credit Union answer due 7/11/2022. (khr)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Sidney Federal Credit Union filed by George Anderson.(O'Hara, Trista)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: No later than 7/25/2022, Plaintiff is directed to file a status report as to the status of service of process on Defendant Friendly Ford of Hamilton, Inc. In light of Text Order 8 , the Rule 16 initial conference scheduled for 6/27/2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric and the deadlines for filing of Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are all STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/16/2022. (jdp)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Following a telephone pre-motion conference with the Court on June 13, 2022, the plaintiff will be permitted to file an amended complaint within two weeks of the date of this text order. Amended Complaint due by 6/27/2022; It is further ORDERED that the defendant is permitted to file its motion to dismiss. Defendant Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 7/18/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 06/13/2022. (ban)
June 13, 2022 TEXT Minute Entry for Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 6/13/2022 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Peter Siachos, Esq. for the defendants - with Kristin Lee, Esq. and Eric Evans, Esq.; NO Appearance from plaintiff's counsel Trista O'Hara. Judge D'Agostino's Chambers tried to contact plaintiff's counsel via email and telephone before the conference began. After waiting to start for 6 minutes, Judge D'Agostino proceeded with the conference call with Peter Siachos, Esq.; Judge D'Agostino questioned defense counsel regarding his pre-motion letter filed with the Court. Counsel for the defendant addresses the Court; The Court will permit the plaintiff to file an amended complaint, if they so choose - an amended complaint may be filed on or before 6/27/22; The defendant is granted leave to file their motion to dismiss. They may move to dismiss the complaint, or if an amended complaint is filed the amended complaint, on or before 7/18/22. A text order will be issued.(Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson, CRD Britney Norton [Time 12:30 p.m. - 12:49 p.m.]) (ban)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation. Answer is now due 6/27/2022 for Defendant Sidney Federal Credit Union. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 5/31/2022. (jdp)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Move by Sidney Federal Credit Union. (Siachos, Peter)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Peter G. Siachos for Sidney Federal Credit Union requesting Pre-motion conference submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Siachos, Peter)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (khr)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Initial Conference set for 6/27/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/21/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
May 23, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Sidney Federal Credit Union answer due 5/27/2022. (khr)
May 23, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Sidney Federal Credit Union regarding the #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address, phone number and/or email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. the address of the attorney is different on the documents than what the Court has listed The documents list the attorney address as 1 Battery Park Plaza, 28th Floor, New York, NY 10004 and the address for the attorney listed with PACER is 18 Columbia Turnpike, Florham Park, NJ 07932. Kindly advise the court the correct address. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 5/25/2022 (khr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court - County of Madison. (khr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Madison, case number EF2022-1101 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5911554) filed by Sidney Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Friendly Ford of Hamilton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Anderson
Represented By: Trista F. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friendly Ford of Hamilton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?