Drumm et al v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Drumm and Michelle Drumm
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Terence P. O'Connor
Case Number: 5:2023cv00550
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
2 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER : Court reviewed letter request (Dkt. No. 16) for extension to serve discovery demands which is granted for the reasons stated. The parties deadline to serve written discovery requests is extended to 7/7/2023. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/30/2023. (sg)
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 First Letter Motion from Alexander J. Douglas for Travelers Commercial Insurance Company requesting Extension of deadline for defendant to serve its written discovery requests submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Douglas, Alexander)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Terry O'Connor has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Martin A. Lynn and Alexander J. Douglas. Dated: June 13, 2023(Lynn, Martin)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff to file joint status report by 8/31/2023 re: whether R. 33 and 34 Requests have been timely served and responded to, any discovery issues, and depositions scheduled, if any. If mediation has been scheduled, the status report should include date of mediation. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/8/2023. (sg)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 6/30/2023. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 10/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/8/2023. (sg)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 3 days, to be held at Syracuse NY. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 6/30/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/25/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2023. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/31/2023. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/31/2023. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/8/2023. Discovery due by 1/31/2024. Discovery Motions due 2/14/2024. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/15/2024. Mandatory Mediation deadline: 10/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/8/2023. (sg)
June 8, 2023 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/8/2023. Appearances: Martin Lynn, Esq. for Plaintiffs; Alexander Douglas, Esq. for Defendant. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures completed. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (sg)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Letter Request to reschedule the telephone initial conference. Telephone Initial Conference RESCHEDULED for 6/8/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/2/2023. (sg)
June 2, 2023 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Martin A. Lynn for Gregory Drumm, Michelle Drumm requesting Adjournment of conference submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Lynn, Martin)
May 31, 2023 **PLEASE READ** IMPORTANT TEXT NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: the 6/7/2023 9:30am telephone Initial Conference: Counsel are directed to call the following number for this conference: 315-691-0477, and enter ID code 217 269 087 to connect to the conference. (sg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (prepared jointly) by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Douglas, Alexander)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gregory Drumm, Michelle Drumm. (Lynn, Martin)
May 15, 2023 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Commercial Insurance Company.. (Douglas, Alexander)
May 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew C. Ronan on behalf of Travelers Commercial Insurance Company (Ronan, Matthew)
May 11, 2023 Filing 5 Verified ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company.(Douglas, Alexander)
May 8, 2023 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from this action. Having reviewed this matter more closely, it has come to my attention that I may have a conflict of interest, and therefore I recuse myself from this case. WHEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk enter this Text Order of Recusal for the undersigned; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another United States District Judge. (U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby no longer assigned to this case. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks remains as the assigned magistrate judge in this action). SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/8/2023. (sal)
May 5, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 6/7/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/31/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc)
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS and COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs in NYS Supreme Court Onondaga County. (ztc)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court Onondaga County, case number 002632/2023 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6286252) filed by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit C- CSC Notice of Service of Process, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)
May 5, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for Travelers Commercial Insurance Company answer due 5/12/2023. (ztc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drumm et al v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Drumm
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Drumm
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander J. Douglas
Represented By: Matthew C. Ronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Terence P. O'Connor
Represented By: Terence P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?