Town of Salina, New York v. CWP Syracuse I LLC
Plaintiff: Town of Salina, New York
Defendant: CWP Syracuse I LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv00748
Filed: June 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Filing 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. The #5 Notice of Admission Requirement was sent to Todd Soloway, Esq., 7 Times Square, New York, NY 10036. Envelope marked Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward. (pjh, )
August 7, 2023 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion requesting an eight-day extension of time to file a Reply in Support of its #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court: It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs request for an extension of time to file a reply brief is GRANTED; The Plaintiffs Reply to Response to Motion is due to be filed on or before 8/16/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 08/07/2023. (ban)
August 7, 2023 Filing 27 Letter Motion from David M. Capriotti, Esq. for Town of Salina, New York requesting an eight-day extension of time to file a Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand (ECF No. 22) to August 16, 2023 submitted to Judge Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino . (Capriotti, David)
August 1, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by CWP Syracuse I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of P. Amsellem in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C - Summary Chart)(Amsellem, Perry)
July 17, 2023 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER : Granting #24 Letter Request to adjourn defendant's time to answer the complaint or otherwise respond until plaintiff's #22 motion to remand is resolved. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/17/2023. (kmc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 24 (Joint Letter on Consent) Letter Motion from Perry Amsellem for CWP Syracuse I LLC regarding adjourning Defendant's time to respond to complaint until Plaintiff's motion to remand is decided submitted to Judge Hon. Mae A. D' Agostino . (Amsellem, Perry) Modified on 7/11/2023 to reflect corrected docket text. Docket text originally stated 'requesting Defendant's time to Respond to Complaint be adjourned to July 13, 2023' (egr).
July 11, 2023 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Town of Salina, New York. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino filed by Town of Salina, New York. (Capriotti, David)
July 11, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Town of Salina, New York. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 8/1/2023. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/8/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Capriotti, David)
July 11, 2023 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #24 Letter Request/Motion, filed by CWP Syracuse I LLC. Docket text edited to reflect correct content of letter. (egr)
July 10, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perry Max-Emile Amsellem on behalf of CWP Syracuse I LLC (Amsellem, Perry)
June 30, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan M. Palfreyman on behalf of Town of Salina, New York (Palfreyman, Brendan)
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Capriotti on behalf of Town of Salina, New York (Capriotti, David)
June 29, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CWP Syracuse I LLC of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiff Town of Salina, New York (Keating, Lawrence)
June 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence P. Keating on behalf of CWP Syracuse I LLC (Keating, Lawrence)
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Itai Y. Raz on behalf of CWP Syracuse I LLC (Raz, Itai)
June 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd B. Marcus on behalf of CWP Syracuse I LLC (Marcus, Todd)
June 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd E. Soloway on behalf of CWP Syracuse I LLC (Soloway, Todd)
June 26, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Granting #12 Letter Request for an extension of time to answer the complaint or otherwise respond. CWP Syracuse I LLC answer due 7/13/2023. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/26/2023. (kmc)
June 22, 2023 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Nicholas G. Saady for CWP Syracuse I LLC requesting Amending the Docket to Reflect the Parties' Stipulation for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 13, 2023 submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Saady, Nicholas)
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (ztc)
June 21, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for CWP Syracuse I LLC answer due 6/23/2023. (ztc)
June 21, 2023 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, #7 Notice of Admission Requirement, Clerk listed the wrong party in the docket text that these attorneys represent. Clerk modified the docket text to reflect that these attorneys represent defendant not Plaintiff. (ztc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff Town of Salina, New York; Attorney Joseph V. Frateschi, Esq., Phone number is (315)477 0100. Admissions due by 7/5/2023. (ztc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendant CWP Syracuse I LLC; Attorney Jacob B. Orgel, Esq., Phone number is (212)421-4100. Admissions due by 7/5/2023. (ztc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendant CWP Syracuse I LLC; Attorney Lawrence Keating, Esq.,. Phone number is (212)421-4100. Admissions due by 7/5/2023. (ztc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendant CWP Syracuse I LLC; Attorney Itai Raz, Phone number is (212)421-4100. Admissions due by 7/5/2023. (ztc) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (ztc, ).
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendant CWP Syracuse I LLC; Attorney Perry M. Amsellem, Esq.,. Phone number is (212)421-4100. Admissions due by 7/5/2023. (ztc) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (ztc, ).
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendant CWP Syracuse I LLC; Attorney Todd E. Soloway, Esq.,. Phone number is (212)421-4100. Admissions due by 7/5/2023. (ztc) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (ztc, ).
June 20, 2023 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/19/2023 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/12/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc)
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CWP Syracuse I LLC identifying Corporate Parent CWP Holdco LLC for CWP Syracuse I LLC. (ztc)
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court Onondaga County. (ztc)
June 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court Onondaga County, case number 005226/2023 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6339656) filed by CWP Syracuse I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Salina, New York v. CWP Syracuse I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Salina, New York
Represented By: Brendan M. Palfreyman
Represented By: David M. Capriotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWP Syracuse I LLC
Represented By: Nicholas G. Saady
Represented By: Todd E. Soloway
Represented By: Itai Y. Raz
Represented By: Lawrence P. Keating
Represented By: Perry Max-Emile Amsellem
Represented By: Todd B. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?