United States of America v. One 2017 Ford F-150 XLT Supercrew Truck, VIN: 1FTEW1EGXHFB89197 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2017 Ford F-150 XLT Supercrew Truck, VIN: 1FTEW1EGXHFB89197 and One 2015 Honda Civic EX, VIN: 19XFB2F83FE208466
Case Number: 5:2023cv01461
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication of Notice of Forfeiture; Last publication date December 22, 2023 in the government's internet website: www.forfeiture.gov; last day to file a claim is January 22, 2024. filed by United States of America (Conger, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of a copy of the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, the Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem and the Notice to Potential Claimant via United States Postal Service, certified and regular mail to Jose A. Morales Velez, Alicia Morelles, Alondra Berrios, and George Hildebrandt, Esq., attorney for Eric Ares. (Conger, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem #2 Returned executed on 12/4/2023. (ztc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of United States Marshals Service Returned executed as to 12/4/2023 arrest of One 2017 Ford F-150 XLT Supercrew Truck, VIN: 1FTEW1EGXHFB89197 and One 2015 Honda Civic EX, VIN: 19XFB2F83FE208466 and put into USMS Custody. (ztc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued. (ztc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM (Fee waived) against One 2015 Honda Civic EX, VIN: 19XFB2F83FE208466 and One 2017 Ford F-150 XLT Supercrew Truck, VIN: 1FTEW1EGXHFB89197 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2017 Ford F-150 XLT Supercrew Truck, VIN: 1FTEW1EGXHFB89197 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2017 Ford F-150 XLT Supercrew Truck, VIN: 1FTEW1EGXHFB89197
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2015 Honda Civic EX, VIN: 19XFB2F83FE208466
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?