Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angie Boudreaux
Defendant: Systems East, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Barbara Williams
Case Number: 5:2023cv01498
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) against Systems East, Inc. filed by Angie Boudreaux, Barbara Williams.(Barney, Mason)
January 26, 2024 ***Answer due date updated for #18 Amended Complaint for Systems East, Inc. answer due 2/23/2024. (ztc)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST BE FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/25/2024. (jdc )
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and General Order #25 served on Jeanne Day on December 8, 2023, filed by Angie Boudreaux. (McGuire, Kate)
January 19, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachele R. Byrd on behalf of Angie Boudreaux (Byrd, Rachele)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST BE FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in this case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/18/2024. (jdc )
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (McGuire, Kate)
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS: Motion to Consolidate Cases #9 filed in Docket 5:23-cv-01498-DNH-ML, Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc., is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent as follows herein, in that, actions involving common questions of law or fact pending before a court may be consolidated to avoid unnecessary costs or delay [See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) & N.D.N.Y. General Order 12, G.2], and with that principle in mind: (1) the Clerk of Court shall CONSOLIDATE Civil Action Nos. 5:23-cv-01498-DNH-ML, Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc., AND 5:23-cv-01571-DNH-ML, Williams v. Systems East, Inc., with 5:23-cv-01498-DNH-ML, Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc., being designated as the LEAD case and 5:23-cv-01571-DNH-ML, Williams v. Systems East, Inc., being designated as the MEMBER case; (2) ALL FUTURE FILINGS IN BOTH OF THESE CASES ARE TO BE FILED ONLY IN THE DOCKET FOR LEAD CASE NO. 5:23-cv-01498-DNH-ML, Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc.; (3) Rachele R. Byrd, Esq., of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP, (Wolf Haldenstein) and Mason A. Barney, Esq., of Siri & Glimstad LLP, (Siri & Glimstad) are appointed as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel in the consolidated action; (4) any Amended Complaint shall be filed by 1/26/2024; (5) Defendant shall respond to the operative pleading by 2/23/2024; (6) the Rule 16 Initial Conference is scheduled for 3/13/2024 at 2:30 p.m., via Teams teleconference, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric [the Courtroom Deputy will send all counsel the Teams link]; (7) the Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/6/2024; (8) pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court; and (9) the Clerk of Court shall file this Text Order in BOTH dockets 5:23-cv-01498-DNH-ML, Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc., AND 5:23-cv-01571-DNH-ML, Williams v. Systems East, Inc. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/5/2024. (jdc )
January 5, 2024 Docket Annotation: Per the Court's #10 Order in 5:23-CV-1571, the cases are now consolidated. This is the lead case and all docketing shall be done in the lead case. (jdc )
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Systems East, Inc.. (Braude, Daniel)
January 3, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachele R. Byrd. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachele R. Byrd Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6556598. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition of Admission, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (McGuire, Kate)
December 22, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Angie Boudreaux. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Haroutunian, Gregory)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint with Cover Letter by Systems East, Inc. submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Braude, Daniel)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Braude on behalf of Systems East, Inc. (Braude, Daniel)
December 20, 2023 Filing 6 Supplemental Admission documents re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (Haroutunian, Gregory)
December 19, 2023 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Anderson Berry. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Anderson Berry Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6548074. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Haroutunian, Gregory)
December 4, 2023 TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference scheduled for 3/13/2024 at 2:30PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc )
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff Angie Boudreaux; Attorney M. Anderson Berry, Esq., Gregory Haroutunian, Esq., and Brandon P. Jack, Esq. Email addresses are aberry@justice4you.com, gharoutunian@justice4you.com, and bjack@justice4you.com. Phone number is 916-239-4778. Admissions due by 12/13/2023. (Copy served on attorneys Berry, Haroutunian, and Jack via email on 11/29/2023) (ztc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/13/2024 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/6/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Copy served on attorneys Berry, Haroutunian, and Jack via email on 11/29/2023) (ztc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Systems East, Inc. (ztc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Systems East, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6527881) filed by Angie Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Systems East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Boudreaux
Represented By: Benjamin Y. Kaufman
Represented By: Kate M. McGuire
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Represented By: Mason A. Barney
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Systems East, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Braude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Barbara Williams
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Represented By: Mason A. Barney
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?