Utica Mutual Insurance Company v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Utica Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2009cv00853
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Utica Office
County: Oneida
Presiding Judge: Gustave J. DiBianco
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 JUDGMENT in favor of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company against Utica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Appeals Notice) (khr)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying Deft's 442 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying Deft's 444 Motion to correct the interest calculation in the judgment. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/28/18. (sfp, )
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 DECISION & ORDER regarding deposition ruling on Anthony Paolozzi and Garrett Redmond. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 12/11/2017. (see)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 DECISION & ORDER regarding depositions of Halter and Glover. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/30/2017. (see)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 422 DECISION & ORDER regarding Bradshaw and Konkel deposition testimony. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/28/2017. (see)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER that Utica Mutual Insurance Company's 364 Motion in Limine to preclude certain expert testimony by Garrett Rdmond is GRANTED; that deft Fireman's Fund Insurance Company's 383 Omnibus Motion in Limine to preclude five specific matters is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and that Plaintiff Utica Mutual Insurance Company's 384 omnibus motion in limine to preclude fourteen specific matters is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/16/2017. (see)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying Utica Mutual Insurance Company's 274 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the follow the fortunes doctrine; granting Fireman's Fund Insurance Company's 275 Motion for Partial Summary Judgme nt dismissing Count II; granting in part and denying in part Fireman's Fund Insurance Company's 276 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings dismissing Counts II and III, Count III is dismissed; denying Fireman's Fund Insurance Company& #039;s 277 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I; denying Fireman's Fund Insurance Company's 279 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I; denying Utica Mutual Insurance Company's 280 Motion for Partial Summary Judgmen t that notice was not due before February 1999; denying Utica Mutual Insurance Company's 283 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that FFIC is not entitled to rescission; denying Fireman's Fund Insurance Company's 331 Motion in Limine to preclude the expert testimony of Dennis R. Connolly. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/24/17. (sfp, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying Utica Mutual Insurance Company's 239 AND 243 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/9/15. (sfp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utica Mutual Insurance Company v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua L. Milrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?