Myers v. Bucca et al
Plaintiff: |
Scott Myers |
Defendant: |
Charles Bucca, Greg Seeley, Patrolman Rowell, Alan Frisbee, Donna Baeckmann, Michael Spitz, Terry Wilhelm and Bobby Haines |
Case Number: |
6:2015cv00553 |
Filed: |
May 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Utica Office |
County: |
Oneida |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew T. Baxter |
Presiding Judge: |
David N. Hurd |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 22, 2018 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM, DECISION AND ORDER denying Pltf's 55 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 56 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 61 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Court will entertain no further applications for reconsideration of its prior orders. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 3/22/18. (Copy served via regular mail)(sfp, )
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM, DECISION AND ORDER granting Deft Rowell's 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying Pltf's 46 Cross-Motion. The amended complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 6/13/17. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(sfp, )
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
23
DECISION AND ORDER accepting Pltf's second amended complaint only as against Deft Rowell, and only insofar as it alleges malicious prosecution in claim 3. All remaining claims against all other defts are dismissed. Pltf's "Motion for R uling on the Accrual" is denied [ECF No. 12]. Pltf's "Motion to Renew" is denied [ECF No. 15]. Pltf's "Petition to Pause Pending Related State Appeals" is denied [ECF No. 19]. Pltf's "Motion to Bifurcate" is denied [ECF No. 21]. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 1/14/16. [Served by mail.] (sfp, )
|
November 10, 2015 |
Filing
14
DECISION AND ORDER adopting 5 Report and Recommendations. Pltf's complaint is dismissed with prejudice as against defts Bucca, Wilhelm, Frisbee and Baeckmann. Pltf's complaint is dismissed without prejudice as against defts Seeley, Spitz and Haines. Any claims against deft Rowell, relating to his testimony at trial and for false arrest are dismissed with prejudice. Pltf's proposed 9 amended complaint shall be reviewed by Honorable Baxter to determine its compliance with the R&R and 28 USC 1915A and 1915(e). Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/10/15. [Served by mail.] (sfp, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?