Syfert v. City of Rome
Plaintiff: Mark Syfert
Defendant: City of Rome
Case Number: 6:2017cv00578
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Utica Office
County: Oneida
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ORDER denying # 13 Plaintiff's second motion to appoint counsel; and accepting and adopting # 11 Magistrate Judge Dancks' Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Plaintiff's # 9 Amended Complaint is sua sponte dism issed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/22/18. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER accepting and adopting # 4 Magistrate Judge Dancks' Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The following claims in Plaintiff's Complaint are sua sponte DISMISSED with prejudice: (1) Plaintiff's malicious prosec ution claims; (2) Plaintiffs claims for violation of his right to a speedy trial; and (3) Plaintiff's conspiracy claims related to his malicious prosecution claims and speedy trial claims. It is ordered that the following (remaining) claims in P laintiff's Complaint shall be DISMISSED with prejudice UNLESS, within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Decision and Order, Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint curing the pleading defects in those claims identified by Magistrate Judge Dancks in the Report-Recommendation: (1) Plaintiff's claims based on mistreatment by officials of the City of Rome, claims based on the City of Rome's code enforcement policies and procedures, claims based on the City of Rome's plumbing and plumber licensing policies and procedures, and claims for conspiracy related to any of those claims, based on events occurring before May 24, 2014; (2) Plaintiff's conspiracy claims related to the above-referenced time-barred claims; (3) Plainti ff's municipal-liability claims pursuant to Monell. Should Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint, it shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Dancks for review; if however, Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the thirty (30) day period, this action will be dismissed with prejudice without further Order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/9/17. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and REPORT-RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint and 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Syfert. ORDERED that Plaintiff's 2 IFP Application is GRANTED and it is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's 1 compla int be DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim. It is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's time-barred claims, claims for conspiracy based upon the same, and Monell claims be dismissed wit h leave to amend. It is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims for malicious prosecution and speedy trial, and claims for conspiracy based upon the same, be dismissed without leave to amend. (Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2017, Case Review Deadline 8/28/2017) Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/7/2017. (Copy served via regular and certified) (dpk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syfert v. City of Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Syfert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?