County of Oneida, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Oneida, New York
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, John Doe, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, John Does, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John Doe Corporation, Lynn Webster, Actavis PLC and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00314
Filed: March 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Utica Office
County: Oneida
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-45338, filed 04/04/2018. (plp)
April 4, 2018 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
April 4, 2018 Filing 21 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #18. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
April 2, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Allergan PLC answer due 4/16/2018; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation answer due 4/17/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. answer due 4/16/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. answer due 4/17/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/17/2018; Mallinckrodt, LLC answer due 4/17/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/17/2018; Purdue Pharma, Inc. answer due 4/16/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 4/16/2018. (see)
April 2, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Teva Pharmacueticals USA Inc on 03/26/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Purdue Pharma Inc. on 03/26/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Cardinal Health Inc. on 03/26/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical Inc nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Mallinckrodt LLC on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
April 2, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Actavis Pharma, Inc. answer due 4/12/2018; Cephalon, Inc. answer due 4/13/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. answer due 4/13/2018; Insys Therapeutics, Inc. answer due 4/13/2018; McKesson Corporation answer due 4/13/2018; Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. answer due 4/12/2018; Purdue Pharma, L.P. answer due 4/12/2018; Watson Laboratories, Inc. answer due 4/12/2018. (see)
March 27, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Watson Laboratories, Inc. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Purdue Pharma, L.P. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on McKesson Corporation on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Insys Therapeutics, Inc. on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Endo Health Solutions, Inc. on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Cephalon, Inc. on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 27, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis)
March 15, 2018 TEXT NOTICE Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see)
March 14, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/18/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons for Cephalon, Inc., #4 Summons for Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #5 Summons for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons for Johnson & Johnson, #7 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #9 Summons for Endo Health Solutions Inc., #10 Summons for Endo Pharaceuticals, Inc., #11 Summons for Mallinckrodt PLC, #12 Summons for Mallinckrodt LLC, #13 Summons for Allergan PLC, #14 Summons for Watson Pharaceuticals, Inc, #15 Summons for Watson Laboratories, Inc., #16 Summons for Actavis LLC, #17 Summons for Actavis Pharma, Inc., #18 Summons for Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #19 Summons for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #20 Summons for Cardinal Health, Inc., #21 Summons for McKesson Corporation, #22 Summons for Russell Portenoy, #23 Summons for Perry Fine, #24 Summons for Scott Fishman, #25 Summons for Lynn Webster, #26 Summons for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharaceuticals, Inc.)(see)
March 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4320569) filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Oneida, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Oneida, New York
Represented By: Eva Marie Pearlman
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?