Woods v. Hess Retail Stores, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Travis Woods
Defendant: Speedway LLC and Hess Retail Stores, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv01416
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hess Retail Stores, LLC, Speedway LLC identifying Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC.. (Messer, Suzanne)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hess Retail Stores, LLC, Speedway LLC.(Messer, Suzanne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Woods. Speedway LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 1/31/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Woods. Hess Retail Stores, LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 1/31/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER approving #5 Letter Request and [5-1] Stipulation. The deadline for all defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to 1/31/2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/31/2018. (Baxter, Andrew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Letter Request/ Letter Motion from Attorney Suzanne Messer for Hess Retail Stores, LLC, Speedway LLC requesting extension of time until January 31, 2019 for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond)(Messer, Suzanne)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Messer on behalf of All Defendants (Messer, Suzanne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hess Retail Stores, LLC and Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jdp, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4582719) filed by Travis Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Hess Retail Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Woods
Represented By: Andrew D. Bizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Suzanne M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores, LLC
Represented By: Suzanne M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?