Bowker et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Amber M. Bowker and John H. Bowker
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00295
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Wagner, Mark)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: granting #8 Letter Request for an extension of time. The joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/1/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is rescheduled for 5/8/2019 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/27/2019. (nmk)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Gustave J. DeTraglia jr. for John H. Bowker requesting new schedule submitted to Judge Andrew Baxter . (DeTraglia, Gustave)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Troisi on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Troisi, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company re #5 Answer to Complaint (Wagner, Mark)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Verified ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Wagner, Mark)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order,, (Wagner, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxters chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Initial Conference set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/28/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (khr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Herkimer, case number EFCA2019-000315 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4668204) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)
March 4, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company answer due 3/11/2019. (khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowker et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber M. Bowker
Represented By: Gustave J. DeTraglia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Bowker
Represented By: Gustave J. DeTraglia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark J. Wagner, Jr.
Represented By: Michael A Troisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?