UFCW Local One Pension Fund
Plaintiff: Robert Boehlert, Mark Manna, Gregory Gorea, Frank C. DeRiso, Michael R. Bull and UFCW Local One Pension Fund
Defendant: L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00645
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In light of the #7 Clerk's Entry of Default, the Rule 16 conference set for 8/29/2019 and 8/22/2019 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, at a later date. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/16/2019. (nmk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to re #6 Request for Entry of Default. (khr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc. by UFCW Local One Pension Fund, Mark Manna, Gregory Gorea, Michael R. Bull, Robert Boehlert, Frank C. DeRiso. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Gormley, Alexander)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: On 6/21/2019, plaintiffs filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendant on 6/17/2019. The time for defendant to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 7/15/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/10/2019. (nmk)
June 21, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc. answer due 7/8/2019. (sfp, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc. on 6/17/2019, filed by Robert Boehlert, Michael R. Bull, Frank C. DeRiso, Gregory Gorea, Mark Manna, UFCW Local One Pension Fund. (Gormley, Alexander)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Initial Conference set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc.. (khr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4756604) filed by UFCW Local One Pension Fund, Mark Manna, Gregory P. Gorea, Michael R. Bull, Robert Boehlert, Frank C. DeRiso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UFCW Local One Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Boehlert
Represented By: Alexander M. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Manna
Represented By: Alexander M. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Gorea
Represented By: Alexander M. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank C. DeRiso
Represented By: Alexander M. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Bull
Represented By: Alexander M. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local One Pension Fund
Represented By: Alexander M. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.K.R. Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?