Ragona et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Giacinto Ragona and Antoinette Ragona
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00917
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 9/25/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 2/28/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/28/2019. (jdp )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 3. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2019. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Motions to be filed by 5/27/2020. Status Report due by 11/6/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/28/2019. (jdp )
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/28/2019; APP: P. Slade, Esq. for Plaintiff and M. Kelly, Esq. for Defendant; Mandatory Mediation to be completed by 2/28/2020. Pretrial deadlines are discussed and set; Pretrial Order to be issued. A Telephone Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call to chambers, which can be reached at 607-779-2628. Counselors are reminded that the scheduling and deadlines as reflected in the pretrial order are firm. (jdp)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Letter motion #11 requesting permission to appear by telephone conference for the IN PERSON Rule 16 initial conference is DENIED. This Court conducts all Rule 16 initial conferences in all cases In Person and requires all counsel to appear In Person regardless at to where counsels offices are located. This rule is applied in all cases and no exceptions are granted. The Rule 16 Initial Conference will be conducted In Person in Binghamton, New York. If for some reason counsel cannot make it to the In Person conference currently scheduled due to conflicts in schedule, counsel can file a letter motion seeking to adjourn the In Person conference and the Court will consider setting it for another date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/26/2019. (jdp)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Meagan Kelly for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. requesting Appearance by Telephone for Initial Conference submitted to Judge Magis. Judge Lovric . (Kelly, Meagan)
August 22, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY : Clerk deleted plaintiff's 8 Notice as the Procedural Memorandum advises that the form should not be filed but merely returned to the Clerk. (jdp )
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Antoinette Ragona, Giacinto Ragona. (White, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. White on behalf of Antoinette Ragona, Giacinto Ragona (White, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Pollack on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Pollack, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Nathan Giacopelli on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Giacopelli, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Plainitffs' Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Kelly, Meagan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Giacopelli, Michael)
July 30, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. answer due 8/9/2019. (khr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2019 11:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/21/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (khr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, County of Otsego, case number EF2019-498 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4812703) filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragona et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giacinto Ragona
Represented By: Michael L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Ragona
Represented By: Michael L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: David M. Pollack
Represented By: Meagan Marie Kelly
Represented By: Michael Nathan Giacopelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?