Benedetto v. New York State Office of Children and Family Services
Plaintiff: Brooke Marie Benedetto
Defendant: New York State Office of Children and Family Services
Case Number: 6:2019cv00994
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing is reset for 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. As a reminder, all motions are considered on the submission of the papers, only. No personal appearances are required. No oral arguments will be entertained. (sas)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on October 04, 2019. (sas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brooke Marie Benedetto. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Hartt, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 11/5/2019 and 11/12/2019 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the #9 motion to dismiss. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/2/2019. (nmk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn Response to Motion due by 10/29/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/4/2019. filed by New York State Office of Children and Family Services. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Koster, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke Marie Benedetto. New York State Office of Children and Family Services served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Hartt, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke Marie Benedetto. New York State Office of Children and Family Services served on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Hartt, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 Letter Request. The time for defendant New York State Office of Children and Family Services to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 10/7/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/21/2019. (nmk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from AAG Andrew W. Koster for New York State Office of Children and Family Services requesting Extension to Respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Kahn . (Koster, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Koster on behalf of All Defendants (Koster, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/5/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Office of Children and Family Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons for NYS Attorney General)(see)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against New York State Office of Children and Family Services (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4833552) filed by Brooke Marie Benedetto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedetto v. New York State Office of Children and Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Marie Benedetto
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Andrew W. Koster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?