Loomis v. ACE American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William Loomis
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01131
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Phase 1 of discovery is to be completed by 2/28/2020. Counsel are directed to submit a status report, on or before 2/28/2020, regarding an update on the progress of discovery and a proposed dispositive motion deadline relating to the coverage issue. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/29/2019. (nmk)
October 29, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 10/29/2019 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel and waived the case out of the program. Counsel agree that discovery should proceed in phases. Phase 1 of discovery related to the coverage issue is to be completed by 2/28/2020. Discovery as to damages will not go forward at this time. A text order will be issued. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration. Counsel are directed to submit a status report, on or before 2/28/2020, regarding an update on the progress of discovery and a proposed dispositive motion deadline relating to the coverage issue. Appearances: Martha Berry, Esq. and Michael Longstreet, Esq. for plaintiff; Leah Bojnowski, Esq. and Kurt Mullen, Esq. for defendant. Time: 11:33 AM - 11:44 AM. (nmk)
October 25, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the court's calendar, the telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 10/28/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 10/29/2019 at 11:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by ACE American Insurance Company. (Bojnowski, Leah)
October 20, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Loomis. (Berry, Martha)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company (Mullen, Kurt)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kurt M. Mullen is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/4/2019. (nmk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kurt M. Mullen, Esq. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4882928. filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Petition of Kurt M. Mullen, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Declaration of Sponsor in Support of Motion, #4 New Attorney E-filing Registration) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Bojnowski, Leah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by ACE American Insurance Company.(Bojnowski, Leah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha L. Berry on behalf of William Loomis (Berry, Martha)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for ACE American Insurance Company.. (Bojnowski, Leah)
September 12, 2019 ***Answer due date set for ACE American Insurance Company answer due 9/19/2019. (kmp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Kurt M. Mullen, Esq. Phone number is 518-427-2703. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. Copy served upon attorney by regular mail. (kmp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/21/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (kmp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneida County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2019-002173 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4868336) filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loomis v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Loomis
Represented By: Michael J. Longstreet
Represented By: Martha L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Leah Threatte Bojnowski
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?