Li v. Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc et al
Plaintiff: Weidong Li
Defendant: Rongguang Fu, Jixin Cai, Xubo Lu, Kuanliang Hu, Wiwi Nails & Spa Inc., Kuan Liang Hu, Ji Xin Cai, Xu Bo Lu, Rong Guang Fu, Wei Wang and Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv01488
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Weidong Li (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 4, 2019 Filing 29 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/4/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (plp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Leanghour Lim, Esq., Email address is leanghourlim@gmail.com. Phone number is 716-868-9697. Admissions due by 12/17/2019. (plp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Aaron B. Schweitzer, Esq., Email address is troylaw@troypllc.com. Phone number is 718-762-1324. Admissions due by 12/17/2019. (plp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06120. electronically transferred when case opened
November 13, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On agreement of the parties, this case is transferred to the Northern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 1407. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/12/2019) (ks) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/12/2019. (Fletcher, Donnie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Weidong Li.(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leanghour Lim on behalf of Weidong Li. (Lim, Leanghour) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Certification addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John Troy dated October 29, 2019. Document filed by Weidong Li.(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter filed by Weidong Li. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to Tuesday, November 12, 2019, at 4:30 PM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/19/2019) ( Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John Troy dated September 19, 2019 re: Requesting to Reschedule IPTC to an Earlier Time on the Same Day. Document filed by Weidong Li.(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jixin Cai, Rongguang Fu, Kuanliang Hu, Xubo Lu, Wei Wang, Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc.(Chen, Hui) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc.(Chen, Hui) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hui Chen on behalf of Jixin Cai, Rongguang Fu, Kuanliang Hu, Xubo Lu, Wei Wang, Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc. (Chen, Hui) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wiwi Nails & Spa Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by AMY LESCH, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Weidong Li. (Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by AMY LESCH, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Weidong Li. (Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to JIXIN CAI a/k/a Ji Xin Cai a/k/a Jia Xin Cai. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to WEI WANG. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to XUBO LU a/k/a Xu Bo Lu. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to KUANLIANG HU a/k/a Kuan Liang Hu. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to RONGGUANG FU a/k/a Rong Guang Fu. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to WIWI NAILS & SPA INC d/b/a WiWi Nails & Spa. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to WIWI 1 NAIL & SPA INC d/b/a WiWi Nails & Spa. Document filed by Weidong Li. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Weidong Li. (Schweitzer, Aaron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jixin Cai, Rongguang Fu, Kuanliang Hu, Xubo Lu, Wei Wang, Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc, Wiwi Nails & Spa Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Weidong Li.(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WIWI 1 NAIL & SPA INC d/b/a WiWi Nails & Spa; WIWI NAILS & SPA INC d/b/a WiWi Nails & Spa; RONGGUANG FU a/k/a Rong Guang Fu, KUANLIANG HU a/k/a Kuan Liang Hu, XUBO LU a/k/a Xu Bo Lu, WEI WANG, and JIXIN CAI a/k/a Ji Xin Cai, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Weidong Li. (Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jixin Cai, Rongguang Fu, Kuanliang Hu, Xubo Lu, Wei Wang, Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc, Wiwi Nails & Spa Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17172463)Document filed by Weidong Li. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rongguang Fu
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jixin Cai
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xubo Lu
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuanliang Hu
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiwi Nails & Spa Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuan Liang Hu
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ji Xin Cai
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xu Bo Lu
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rong Guang Fu
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Wang
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiwi 1 Nail & Spa Inc
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weidong Li
Represented By: John Troy
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?