The First Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01497
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Defense counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE: to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/15/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 6/30/2020. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 1/24/2020. (nmk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 4/1/2020. Discovery cutoff is 12/18/2020 (plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 9/21/2020; defendant's expert disclosures due by 11/3/2020; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 11/18/2020). Substantive motions are to be filed by 2/8/2021. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Utica. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 1/24/2020. (nmk)
January 24, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 1/24/2020 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel. Mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged by 2/14/2020. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge Scullin. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration. A telephonic status conference is set for 7/13/2020 at 1:30 PM. Appearances: Matthew Noone, Esq. for plaintiff; John Freedenberg, Esq. for defendant. Time: 1:30 PM - 1:43 PM. (nmk)
January 16, 2020 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is MOVED UP to 1/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Proposed - Joint) by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux North America, Inc. for Electrolux Home Products, Inc... (Freedenberg, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Freedenberg, John)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F. Noone on behalf of The First Liberty Insurance Corporation (Noone, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew F. Noone is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/23/2019. (nmk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental Admission documents re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Fallon, Christopher)
December 20, 2019 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew F. Noone. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Declaration of Sponsor The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew F. Noone Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4979554. filed by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Fallon, Christopher)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party The First Liberty Insurance Corporation; Attorney Matthew F. Noone, Esq. Admissions due by 12/18/2019. {Mailed on 12/4/2019} (dpk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (dpk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/25/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4961682) filed by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher C. Fallon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew F. Noone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Freedenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?