Starling et al v. Generac Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wendy F. Starling and John M. Starling
Defendant: Country Home Products, Inc., Generac Acquisition Corp., Generac Holdings Inc., Generac Power Systems, Inc., CHP Holdings, Inc., Country Home Products, Inc. doing business as Neuton Power Equipment, Country Home Products, Inc. doing business as DR Power Equipment and Country Home Products, Inc. doing business as DR Power Equipment doing business as Neuton Power Equipment
Case Number: 6:2020cv01084
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service CHP Holdings Inc. served on Registered Agent on 10/21/2020, filed by John M. Starling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Country Home Products d/b/a DR Power Equipment, #2 Affidavit Country Home Products d/b/a Neutron Power Equipment, #3 Affidavit Country Home Products)(Coffey, Stephen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CHP Holdings, Inc., Country Home Products, Inc., Generac Acquisition Corp., Generac Holdings Inc., Generac Power Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Generac Holdings Inc. for CHP Holdings, Inc., Country Home Products, Inc., Generac Acquisition Corp., Generac Holdings Inc... (Peterman, Alan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CHP Holdings, Inc., Country Home Products, Inc., Generac Acquisition Corp., Generac Holdings Inc., Generac Power Systems, Inc..(Peterman, Alan)
October 28, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for CHP Holdings, Inc. answer due 11/12/2020; Country Home Products, Inc. answer due 11/12/2020. (see)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service Generac Acquisition Corp served on Senior Corporate Counsel on 10/09/2020, filed by John M. Starling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service for Generac Holdings Inc, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service for Generac Power Systems)(Coffey, Stephen)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of service served on Senior Corporate Counsel on 10/12/2020, filed by John M. Starling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Generac Power Systems, #2 Affidavit Generac Holdings Inc.)(Coffey, Stephen)
October 20, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Generac Acquisition Corp. answer due 10/30/2020; Generac Holdings Inc. answer due 10/30/2020; Generac Power Systems, Inc. answer due 10/30/2020. (see)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/3/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to CHP Holdings, Inc., Country Home Products, Inc., Generac Acquisition Corp., Generac Holdings Inc., Generac Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Generac Acquisition Corp., #2 Summons for Generac Power Systems, Inc., #3 Summons for CHP Holdings, Inc., #4 Summons for Country Home Products, Inc., #5 Summons for Country Home Products, Inc., d/b/a DR Power Equipment, #6 Summons for Country Home Products, Inc., d/b/a Neuton Power Equipment)(see)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CHP Holdings, Inc., Country Home Products, Inc., Generac Acquisition Corp., Generac Holdings Inc.,and Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5238306) filed by John M. Starling, Wendy F. Starling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starling et al v. Generac Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generac Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Alan R. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generac Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Alan R. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generac Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Alan R. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alan R. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Home Products, Inc. doing business as Neuton Power Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Home Products, Inc. doing business as DR Power Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Home Products, Inc. doing business as DR Power Equipment doing business as Neuton Power Equipment
Represented By: Alan R. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy F. Starling
Represented By: Stephen R. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Starling
Represented By: Stephen R. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?