State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01305
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: This case is removed from the ADR Program, subject to reconsideration at a later status conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/11/2020. (nmk)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's mandatory disclosures are due by 12/31/2020. Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 5/14/2021. Discovery cutoff is 9/16/2021 (plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 6/18/2021; defendant's expert disclosures due by 8/2/2021; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 8/17/2021). Dispositive motions to be filed by 11/16/2021. Anticipated length of trial: 3-5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/11/2020. (nmk)
December 11, 2020 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/18/2021 at 10:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. (nmk)
December 10, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 12/10/2020 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel and waived the case out of the program. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge D'Agostino. A follow-up telephonic conference is set for 5/18/2020 at 10:30 AM. Appearances: Stuart Markowitz, Esq. for plaintiff; Thomas Cronmiller, Esq. and Janae Cummings, Esq. for defendant. Time: 1:31 PM - 1:44 PM. (nmk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc..(Cronmiller, Thomas)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: granting #7 Letter Request. The time for Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/30/2020. The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is rescheduled to 12/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/18/2020. (nmk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Cronmiller, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Markowitz, Stuart)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/13/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/27/2020. (nmk)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Cronmiller, Thomas)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Initial Conference set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM in Utica before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/16/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
October 22, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. answer due 10/28/2020. (khr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (khr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Herkimer, case number 2020-107197 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5288276) filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Stuart D. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas B. Cronmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?