Vindigni et al v. Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joanne B. Vindigni and Richard Vindigni
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Tops Test Facility 990, Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC and Huahai US, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01627
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 1:21-cv-02361, filed 02/11/2021. (plp)
February 10, 2021 Filing 16 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #35. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. Case is transferred to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2875 Valsartan, Losartan, and Irbesartan Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Robert B. Kugler, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
February 10, 2021 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2875 Valsartan, Losartan, and Irbesartan Products Liability Litigation. (plp)
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Cartwright on behalf of Tops Test Facility 990 (Cartwright, Daniel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Walsh, IV on behalf of Tops Test Facility 990 (Walsh, David)
February 8, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 2/20/2021. (dpk)
February 6, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice with General Order #25 served on TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC on 01/29/2021, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Tops Test Facility 990.(Foti, Melissa)
January 29, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Huahai US, Inc. answer due 2/15/2021; Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. answer due 2/15/2021; Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC answer due 2/15/2021; Tops Test Facility 990 answer due 2/3/2021. (dpk)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice with General Order #25 served on TOPS TEST FACILITY 990 on 01/12/2021, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice with General Order #25 served on SOLCO HEALTHCARE US, INC. on 01/22/0221, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice with General Order #25 served on PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC on 01/22/2021, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice with General Order #25 served on HUAHAI US, INC on 01/22/2021, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Foti on behalf of Tops Test Facility 990 (Foti, Melissa)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and General Order #25 served on TOPS TEST FACILITY on 1/12/2021, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, General Order #25 served on PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. on 01/12/2021, filed by Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni. (Julian, Robert)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Robert F. Julian for Joanne B. Vindigni, Richard Vindigni requesting Subpoena v. Prinston Pharmaceutical submitted to Judge Dancks . (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS)(Julian, Robert)
January 5, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint. Exhibit A contained personal identifiers. Replaced with a redacted copy. (khr)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Tops Test Facility 990. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Solco Healthcare U.S. LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Huahai US, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc, #4 Summons Issued as to Tops Test Facility 990) (dpk)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/31/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Tops Test Facility 990 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5365485) filed by Richard Vindigni and Joanne B. Vindigni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vindigni et al v. Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tops Test Facility 990
Represented By: David H. Walsh, IV
Represented By: Melissa A. Foti
Represented By: Daniel Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huahai US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne B. Vindigni
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Vindigni
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?