CONMED Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CONMED Corporation
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv00083
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CONMED Corporation filed by CONMED Corporation. (Attachments: #1 A - policy, #2 B - Alexander Complaint, #3 C - Sterigenics Agreement, #4 D - earlier Sterigenics Agreement, #5 E - December 4, 2020 letter, #6 F - Second Amended Alexander Complaint)(D'Agostino, Mary)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Lynn Visokey on behalf of CONMED Corporation (Visokey, Erica)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #21 is GRANTED. Defendant is directed to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 23, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/3/2021. (jdp )
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Consent Letter Motion from David C. Sienko for Federal Insurance Company requesting extension of time to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Sienko, David)
February 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Sienko on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Sienko, David)
February 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Klein on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Klein, Lawrence)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Letter Motion #13 . The Attorney Admission requirement for Erica L. Visokey is due on or before March 9, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/12/2021.(jdp )
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/12/2021. (jdp )
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/12/2021. (jdp )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin Cohen Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5416331. filed by CONMED Corporation. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Powers, John)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meredith Elkins Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5416330. filed by CONMED Corporation. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Powers, John)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter Motion from John G. Powers for CONMED Corporation requesting Extension of Time to file Attorney Admission Requirement for Erica L. Visokey submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Powers, John)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #11 is GRANTED. Defendant is directed to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 4, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/3/2021. (jdp )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter Motion from Matthew P. Mazzola for Federal Insurance Company requesting Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Mazzola, Matthew)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Federal Insurance Company answer due 2/19/2021. (map)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Patrick Jones at Federal Insurance Company on 1/29/2021, filed by CONMED Corporation. (D'Agostino, Mary)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Ebony Hill at Federal Insurance Company on 1/27/2021, filed by CONMED Corporation. (D'Agostino, Mary)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company regarding #7 Letter Motion from Mary L. D'Agostino for CONMED Corporation requesting the issuance of an additional summons. (map)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter Motion from Mary L. D'Agostino for CONMED Corporation requesting the issuance of an additional summons submitted to Judge the Clerk of the Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) proposed summons)(D'Agostino, Mary)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff Counsel; Attorney Erica L. Visokey, Esq.. Notice of Attorney Admission Requirement served by regular mail to address: CONMED Corporation, 525 French Road, Utica, NY 13502. Admissions due by 2/9/2021. (map)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE : Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 4/28/2021 at 11:00am has been RESCHEDULED for 4/28/2021 at 1:00PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (map)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff Counsel; Attorney Robin Cohen, Esq. and Meredith Elkins, Esq.. Notice of Admission Requirement served via email. Sent to email addresses: rcohen@cohenziffer.com and melkins@cohenziffer.com. Plaintiff Counsel Phone number is: 212-584-1890. Admissions due by 2/8/2021. (map)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 4/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (map)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Federal Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5394075) filed by CONMED Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Policy, #2 Exhibit B: Alexander Complaint Reference - State Court of Cobb County - State of Georgia, #3 Exhibit C: Sterigenics Agreement, #4 Exhibit D: Previous Sterigenics Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: CONMED December 4, 2020 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONMED Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence Klein
Represented By: David Charles Sienko
Represented By: Matthew P. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONMED Corporation
Represented By: Mary L. D'Agostino
Represented By: John G. Powers
Represented By: Daniel S. Jonas
Represented By: Erica Lynn Visokey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?