Dodd v. Colgate-Palmolive Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeanne Dodd
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company, Kolmar Laboratories, Inc., Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 6:2021cv00114
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/1/21. (ban)
March 1, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jeanne Dodd submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (Dymond, Seth)
February 23, 2021 TEXT NOTICE -RESCHEDULING OF Telephone Rule 16 Conference: The Telephone Initial Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 3/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed no later than 3/17/2021 and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/17/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)****PLEASE NOTE*** Counsel are directed to call the following number for this conference: 1-877-336-1829, access code 8029754, security code 9842.(sg)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket and notes that attorney for defendant/cross claimant Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. ("Kolmar") has failed to gain formal admission to practice in the NDNY as directed in Dkt. No. #7 , and no other attorney has filed a Notice of Appearance for Kolmar. The Court sua sponte extends the time for Attorney McCaffrey to obtain admission to practice and file a notice of appearance for Kolmar to 3/1/2021, or have another attorney who is admitted to the NDNY file an appearance for said defendant/cross claimant. Failure to follow Court orders and directives may result in a recommendation of default by Kolmar. The Clerk is directed to email this Text Order to Attorney McCaffrey at the email address identified in Dkt. No. 7. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/23/2021. (copy of this text order served on attorney McCaffrey as directed by the Court)(sg )
February 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, Richard)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Dymond on behalf of Jeanne Dodd (Dymond, Seth)
February 3, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Removal Statement Pursuant to Judge D'Agostino's Individual Rule 3 (Kurland, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (sg)
February 2, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for the Court's filing order served on Attorneys for Plaintiff and Defendants on February 2, 2021, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s FRCP 7.1 statements served on Attorneys for Plaintiff and Defendants on February 2, 2021, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe recused. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/2/2021. (jel, )
February 1, 2021 TEXT NOTICE to Attorney Thomas Kurland, re: #14 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #13 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Counsel for the plaintiff did not receive notice of electronic filing of the above documents because they are not admitted to this District. Please conventionally serve these documents and electronically file proof of service. (see)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE TO REFILE MOTIONS IN REMOVAL ACTION - This action was removed to federal court. Pursuant to NYND Local Rule 81.3, the Court will not consider a motion that a party filed in the lower court unless that party refiles the motion in this court in accordance with NYND Local Rule 7.1.http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/2015_LOCAL_RULES.pdf (jel, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc... (Kurland, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent NO PARENT CORPORATION for Johnson & Johnson.. (Kurland, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and supporting documents served on Attorneys for Plaintiff and Defendants on February 1, 2021, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/25/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Jeanne Dodd; Attorney Chris Hersom,. Phone number is 212-681-1575. Admissions due by 2/16/2021. {Mailed to attorney on 2/1/2021}(see)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Jeanne Dodd; Attorney Joseph W. Belluck,. Phone number is 212-681-1575. Admissions due by 2/16/2021. {Mailed letter to attorney on 2/1/2021}(see)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.; Attorney Michelle M. Bufano, Email address is mmbufano@pbwt.com. Phone number is (212) 336-2000. Admissions due by 2/16/2021. {Emailed to attorney on 2/1/2021} (see)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.; Attorney Kevin C. McCaffrey, Email address is kevin.mccaffrey@clydeco.us. Phone number is (212) 710-3900. Admissions due by 2/16/2021. {Emailed to counsel on 2/1/2021}(see)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint with CROSSCLAIM against Johnson & Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. by Colgate-Palmolive Company.(see)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to State Court Amended Complaint by Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.(see)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT ANSWER to State Court Amended Complaint by Johnson & Johnson. (see)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint with CROSSCLAIM against Colgate-Palmolive Company, Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. by Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.(see)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(see)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Oneida County, case number EFCA2020-002460 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5401437) filed by Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v. Colgate-Palmolive Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Virginia P. Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Winter
Represented By: Thomas P. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John D. Winter
Represented By: Thomas P. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Dodd
Represented By: Seth A. Dymond
Represented By: Richard M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?