Oneida Indian Nation v. Zucker et al
Plaintiff: Oneida Indian Nation
Defendant: New York State Department of Health., Howard A. Zucker and New York State Department of Health
Case Number: 6:2021cv00466
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Granting #7 Letter Motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Answer due date updated for New York State Department of Health answer due 6/25/2021; Howard A. Zucker answer due 6/25/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/19/2021. (kmc)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Assistant Attorney General Keith Starlin for New York State Department of Health, Howard A. Zucker requesting an extension of time for defendants to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew T. Baxter . (Starlin, Keith)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Shannon J. Prince. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/4/2021. (kmc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shannon J. Prince Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5512901. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Carpinello, George)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Oneida Indian Nation; Attorney Shannon Prince, Esq. Email address is sprince@bsfllp.com. Phone number is (914) 749-8200. Admissions due by 5/10/2021. (jel, )(Copy served via email)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/19/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Department of Health., Howard A. Zucker. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for New York State Department of Health)(jel, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against New York State Department of Health., Howard A. Zucker, Commissioner of New York State Department of Health (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5503765) filed by Oneida Indian Nation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oneida Indian Nation v. Zucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Health.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Zucker
Represented By: Keith J. Starlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Keith J. Starlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneida Indian Nation
Represented By: George F. Carpinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?