Pepitone v. National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Pepitone
Defendant: National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00781
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 10/7/2021 and 9/30/2021 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the #8 motion to dismiss. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/23/2021. (kmc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim With Prejudice filed by National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Kahn Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael F. Buchanan, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Pepitone Licensing Deal, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Pepitone Bankruptcy Petition, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 - Pryor Statement, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4 - Order of Discharge of Debtor, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5 - Order of Discharge and Notice to Creditors, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6 - Pepitone Bankruptcy Docket, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7 - Pepitone Bankruptcy Discharge Order) (Buchanan, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Morrison on behalf of National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc. (Morrison, Clinton)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F Buchanan on behalf of National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc. (Buchanan, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Attorney Joseph A. D'Agostino stating he intends to seek Permanent Admission. Clerk informed him via email that the Notice of Attorney Admissions Requirement Letter #4 contains the instructions to do so. (ztc, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Joseph Pepitone; Attorney Joseph A. D'Agostino, Email address is jdagostino@fdnylawfirm.com. Phone number is (631) 824-6040. Admissions due by 7/22/2021. (ztc, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 10/7/2021 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/30/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc. (ztc, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5577982) filed by Joseph Pepitone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepitone v. National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pepitone
Represented By: David Michael Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Baseball Hall of Fame and Museum, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Morrison
Represented By: Michael F Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?