CONMED Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CONMED Corporation
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv00841
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: In light of Text Order 21 issued by the District Judge, the Rule 16 initial telephone conference scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric and the deadlines for filing the Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of the Mandatory Disclosures are STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/20/2021. (jdp )
September 20, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER re #19 Letter Motion requesting a Pre-Motion Conference: The Court is in receipt of the plaintiff's pre-motion letter seeking leave to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, and the defendant's pre-motion response [dkt. no. 20]. The Court does not see a need for a pre-motion conference in this case at this time. The plaintiff's request for leave to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED; The Motion shall be filed on or before 10/22/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/20/21. (ban)
September 15, 2021 Filing 20 Letter Motion from Lawrence Klein for Federal Insurance Company requesting a Pre-Motion Conference in connection with Federal Insurance Company's anticipated Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings submitted to Judge Mae D' Agostino . (Klein, Lawrence)
September 14, 2021 Filing 19 Pre-Motion Letter by CONMED Corporation requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 9/20/2021 (D'Agostino, Mary)
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company.(Klein, Lawrence)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.. (Klein, Lawrence)
August 17, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Federal Insurance Company answer due 8/27/2021. (ban)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin L. Cohen on behalf of CONMED Corporation (Cohen, Robin)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Amended Filing Order served on Federal Insurance Company c/o CT Corporation on 08/06/2021, filed by CONMED Corporation. (Elkins, Meredith)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/10/2021. (jdp )
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin L. Cohen Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5609525. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Elkins, Meredith)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Elkins on behalf of CONMED Corporation (Elkins, Meredith)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. This summons contains a different address than the Summons Issued on 7/27/2021. (ztc, )
August 1, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): CONMED Corporation is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (D'Agostino, Mary)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONMED Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CONMED Corporation for CONMED Corporation.. (D'Agostino, Mary)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/20/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/27/21. (ban)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (ztc, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (ztc, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party CONMED Corporation; Attorney Robin Cohen, Esq. and Meredith Elkins, Esq., Email addresses are rcohen@cohenziffer.com and melkins@cohenziffer.com. Their Phone number is 212-584-1890. Admissions due by 8/10/2021. (ztc, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): CONMED Corporation is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (D'Agostino, Mary)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/27/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/20/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
July 27, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 6:21-cv-00083-MAD-ML. (ztc, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Federal Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5596481) filed by CONMED Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONMED Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONMED Corporation
Represented By: Daniel S. Jonas
Represented By: Erica Lynn Visokey
Represented By: John G. Powers
Represented By: Mary L. D'Agostino
Represented By: Meredith Elkins
Represented By: Robin L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?