Arabia-Andrews et al v. Captain John's Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Arabia-Andrews and Tricia Harmon
Defendant: Captain John's Restaurant, Inc., Elaine Brown and Andy Brown
Case Number: 6:2021cv00868
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Arabia-Andrews, Tricia Harmon. Captain John's Restaurant, Inc. waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Cook, Jared)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Arabia-Andrews, Tricia Harmon. Elaine Brown waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Cook, Jared)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Arabia-Andrews, Tricia Harmon. Andy Brown waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Cook, Jared)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Michelle Arabia-Andrews, Tricia Harmon of Consent to be a Party Plaintiff (Cook, Jared)
August 31, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 2:30 PM has been RESCHEDULED for 11/9/2021 at 2:30 P.M., via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/3/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)(jdp )
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Captain John's Restaurant, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Andy Brown, #2 Summons Issued as to Elaine Brown)(pjh, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Andy Brown, Elaine Brown and Captain John's Restaurant, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5603184) filed by Michelle Arabia-Andrews and Tricia Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arabia-Andrews et al v. Captain John's Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Arabia-Andrews
Represented By: Galen C. Baynes
Represented By: Jared K. Cook
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Harmon
Represented By: Galen C. Baynes
Represented By: Jared K. Cook
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain John's Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?