Rosas v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Ana M. Rosas
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 6:2021cv01273
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior District Judge Lawrence E. Kahn and U.S. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (map)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Ana M. Rosas advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Ana M. Rosas: The Court having considered Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (Dkt. No. #3 ), it is hereby ORDERED, that the application is GRANTED. **Plaintiff should note that, although the application to proceed in forma pauperis has been granted, Plaintiff will still be required to pay fees that Plaintiff incurs in this action, including copying and/or witness fees. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/1/2021. (sg)
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy Sean Bolen appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 3/1/2022. (Bolen, Timothy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 12/21/2021. (map)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ana M. Rosas. (map)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (map)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. [Assignment Clerk advised Counsel at time of filing that per Court policy a proposed summons in a social security matter such as this is not necessary to the filing.] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons: Kilolo Kijakazi)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosas v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana M. Rosas
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Timothy Sean Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?