The People of the State of New York v. Parker
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York
Defendant: Matthew Parker, Matthew Shane and Matthew Shane Parker
Case Number: 6:2021cv01276
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REPORT - RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew Parker filed by Matthew Parker: ORDERED that Defendant's IFP Application (Dkt. No. 3) is GRANTED solely for purposes of initial review; and it is further RECOMMENDED that the petition for removal (Dkt. No. 1) be DISMISSED and the matter be REMANDED to the state court in which the proceeding was commenced; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk provide Defendant with a copy of this Order and Report-Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2022, Case Review Deadline 1/27/2022), Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew Parker filed by Matthew Parker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/10/2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(ds)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to defendant's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and defendant was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Defendant has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/4/2022. Clerk mailed copy to defendant on 1/5/2022. (ds) Modified on 1/5/2022 to add document number (ds)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis along with a Table of Contents for Brief with Exhibits and envelope filed by Matthew Parker. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (ds)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If Defendant desires to pursue this action, he must, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the full $402.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application. Upon Defendant's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. In accordance with the Local Rule 10.1(c)(2) of the Local Rules for this Court, Defendant shall promptly notify the Clerk's Office and all parties or their counsel, in writing, of any change in his address; Defendant's failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendant, along with a blank IFP Application. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/8/2021. (Copy served upon Defendant, together with a blank IFP application, via regular mail)(sal )
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Unadilla Town Court, citation number #1C27DJXJNZ filed by Matthew Parker, Pro Se. No filing fee was received and no civil cover sheet. Zip Code was not provided, Clerk looked it up and added to the case with attached Uniform Traffic Ticket #1C27DJXJNZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People of the State of New York v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shane Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?