Petty v. Bono et al
Plaintiff: Private Attorney Gen Duane M Petty
Defendant: Treasurer Kim Enea, Vincent J Bono, Assesor Susan Meeker, County Administrator James W. Wallace, County Clerk Sylvia M Rowan, Herkimer County Assistant Attorney Charles Crandal, Attorney Lorraine H Lewandrowski, Judge Thaddeus Luke, Herkimer County Legislator and District 11 Chairman
Case Number: 6:2022cv00620
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Clerk respectfully reminds Pro Se plaintiff Private Attorney Gen Duane M Petty that Objections to the R&R are due by 8/11/2022. (gmd, )
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and REPORT-RECOMMENDATION: it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. #2 ) is GRANTED; and it is further RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #6 ) to the extent that it asserts (1) a claim pursuant toRICO against Defendants in their individual capacities, and (2) any state law claims, because they fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO REPLEAD Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #6 ) to the extent that it asserts (1) a RICO claim against Defendants in their official capacities, and (2) claims pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 241, 371, 2332b and New York Penal Law 496.05, because they fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Plaintiffs request for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. #3 ); and it is furtherORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order Report-Recommendation on Plaintiff, along with copies of the unpublished decisions cited herein in accordance with the Second Circuits decision in Lebron v. Sanders, 557 F.3d 76 (2d Cir. 2009) (per curiam). Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Cases)(Copy served via regular mail)(gmd, )
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vincent J Bono, Kim Enea, Herkimer County Assistant Attorney Charles Crandal, Lorraine H Lewandrowski, Thaddeus Luke, Susan Meeker, Sylvia M Rowan, James W. Wallace, District 11 Chairman, and Herkimer County Legislator filed by Duane M Petty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gmd, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (gmd, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK, LOCAL RULES, and NOTICE issued and explained to Duane M Petty at time complaint was filed. (gmd, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Duane M. Petty requesting Injunction. (gmd, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Duane M Petty (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Treasurer Kim Enea, Vincent J Bono, Assesor Susan Meeker, County Administrator James W. Wallace, County Clerk Sylvia M Rowan, Herkimer County Assistant Attorney Charles Crandal, Attorney Lorraine H Lewandrowski, and Judge Thaddeus Luke ) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (gmd, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Vincent J Bono, Kim Enea, Herkimer County Assistant Attorney Charles Crandal, Lorraine H Lewandrowski, Thaddeus Luke, Susan Meeker, Sylvia M Rowan, James W. Wallace filed by Duane M Petty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petty v. Bono et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Private Attorney Gen Duane M Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer Kim Enea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J Bono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assesor Susan Meeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Administrator James W. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Clerk Sylvia M Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herkimer County Assistant Attorney Charles Crandal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Lorraine H Lewandrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Thaddeus Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herkimer County Legislator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District 11 Chairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?