Nadarevic v. Durham School Services, et al
Plaintiff: Senal Nadarevic
Defendant: Luis Feliz, Omar Mejias, Durham School Services and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2022cv00965
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's motion to remand for the reasons stated in Defendants' letter-brief of October 5, 2022 (Dkt. No. #11 ). SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/19/2022. (sal)
October 5, 2022 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Adam C. Guzik for Durham School Services, Luis Feliz, Omar Mejias submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby with no opposition of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Guzik, Adam)
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Guzik on behalf of Durham School Services, Luis Feliz, Omar Mejias (Guzik, Adam)
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #8 Motion to Remand filed by Senal Nadarevic. (Policelli, Frank)
September 22, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Senal Nadarevic regarding the #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Senal Nadarevic. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. Need to file a Memorandum of Law to #8 Motion to Remand Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/28/2022 (khr)
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Senal Nadarevic. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Policelli, Frank)
September 19, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Notice of Removal. Redacted copy of Dkt. # 7 Civil Cover Sheet was uploaded. The unredacted files are now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P Rule 5.2, and Local Rule 5.2. (khr)
September 16, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal, Dkt. #2 State Court Complaint, Dkt. #3 State Court Records filed, Dkt. #4 State Court Complaint, and Dkt. #6 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement: Redacted copies of Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibits A, B, C, D, Notice: Index of Attachments to Notice of Removal, Dkt. #2 . Dkt. #3 , Dkt. #4 and Dkt. #6 were uploaded to there respective entries. The unredacted files are now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P Rule 5.2, and Local Rule 5.2. NOTICE: Dkt. #1 Attachment (7) has not been submitted with redactions. Reminder that failure to file a redacted documents by the deadline will result in the unredacted documents referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline still set for 9/19/2022 (gmd, )
September 16, 2022 ***Answer to Amended State Court Complaint due date updated for Durham School Services answer due 9/21/2022; Luis Feliz answer due 9/21/2022; Omar Mejias answer due 9/21/2022. (gmd, )
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendants; Attorney Adam Guzik, Esq., Email address is adam.guzik@wilsonelser.com. Phone number is 212.490.3000. Admissions due by 9/29/2022. Clerk mailed a copy notice to counsel on 9/15/22.(gmd, )
September 15, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal, Dkt. #2 State Court Complaint, Dkt. #3 State Court Records filed, Dkt. #4 State Court Complaint, and Dkt. #6 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2 (MINORS NAME and DOB). This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced documents and electronically file the redacted documents within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected documents. Failure to file a redacted documents by the deadline will result in the unredacted documents referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/19/2022 (gmd, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Durham School Services identifying Durham School Services, L.P. as the sole member of Durham D&M LLC. (gmd, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial R. 16 Conference set for 10/31/2022 02:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/24/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court: Oneida County. (gmd, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 State Court Answer filed by Durham School Services re Dkt. #2 State Court Summons and Complaint. (gmd, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS and COMPLAINT relating to Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court: Oneida County. (gmd, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court: Oneida County, case number EFCA2022-000901 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6033937) filed by Omar Mejias, Luis Feliz, Durham School Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Answer, #3 Exhibit C: Amended Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D: Order, #5 Exhibit E: Copy of Electronic Docket, #6 Notice: Index of Attachments to Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadarevic v. Durham School Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Feliz
Represented By: Joseph P. Wodarski
Represented By: Adam C. Guzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Mejias
Represented By: Joseph P. Wodarski
Represented By: Adam C. Guzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham School Services
Represented By: Joseph P. Wodarski
Represented By: Adam C. Guzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Joseph P. Wodarski
Represented By: Adam C. Guzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senal Nadarevic
Represented By: Frank Policelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?