CONMED Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CONMED Corporation
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2023cv00766
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER denying #17 Pre-Motion Letter Request: It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs request for a pre-motion conference and leave to file a motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED until after the Rule 16 conference is held before Judge Lovric. If after that conference counsel still feel that a motion is necessary, they may move without seeking further permission. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 08/01/2023. (ban)
July 27, 2023 Filing 21 Pre-Motion Response to #17 Pre-Motion Letter by CONMED Corporation requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Schiller, Ronald)
July 26, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald P. Schiller on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Schiller, Ronald)
July 26, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald P. Schiller on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Schiller, Ronald)
July 26, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #19 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney email address (rps@hangley.com) contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records (rschiller@hangley.com). Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/31/2023 (mmg)
July 24, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONMED Corporation re #17 Pre-Motion Letter by CONMED Corporation requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino (D'Agostino, Mary)
July 24, 2023 Filing 17 Pre-Motion Letter by CONMED Corporation requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 7/27/2023 (D'Agostino, Mary)
July 12, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin L. Cohen on behalf of CONMED Corporation (Cohen, Robin)
July 11, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONMED Corporation re #1 Complaint, #10 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Summons Issued, #2 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #4 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Elkins, Meredith)
July 11, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CONMED Corporation. Federal Insurance Company waiver sent on 7/7/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Elkins, Meredith)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/10/2023. (jdc )
July 6, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin L. Cohen Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6359722. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Elkins, Meredith)
June 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Matulewicz on behalf of CONMED Corporation (Matulewicz, David)
June 28, 2023 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 G.O. 25 Filing Order, the image has been replaced in its entirety as the original image was filed erroneously and contained a document pertaining to a separate case. (egr)
June 27, 2023 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONMED Corporation. (Elkins, Meredith)
June 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Elkins on behalf of CONMED Corporation (Elkins, Meredith)
June 27, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases [6:21-cv-83, 6:21-cv-841, and 6:23-cv-766] are deemed related. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 06/27/2023. (ban)
June 27, 2023 TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference scheduled 10/17/2023 at 1:00PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdp)
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (egr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (egr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party CONMED Corporation; Attorney Robin Cohen and Attorney Meredith Elkins, Email address is rcohen@cohenziffer.com; melkins@cohenziffer.com. Phone number is 212-584-1890; 212-584-1891. Admissions due by 7/10/2023. Notice and General Order 25 sent via email.(egr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONMED Corporation. (D'Agostino, Mary)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): CONMED Corporation is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Federal Insurance Company re: #1 Complaint,. (D'Agostino, Mary)
June 26, 2023 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/17/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/10/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/28/2023) (egr, ).
June 26, 2023 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 6:21-cv-00083, 6:21-cv-00841. (egr)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Federal Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6346197) filed by CONMED Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit B Excess Policy, #3 Exhibit C Operative Complaint in Landlord Action, #4 Exhibit D Decision in Landlord Coverage Action, #5 Exhibit E 2022 Real Rate Reports, #6 Exhibit F Georgia Decision, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONMED Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONMED Corporation
Represented By: Daniel S. Jonas
Represented By: Erica Lynn Visokey
Represented By: Mary L. D'Agostino
Represented By: John G. Powers
Represented By: David J. Matulewicz
Represented By: Robin L. Cohen
Represented By: Meredith Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald P. Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?