Homesite Insurance Company v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Shenzhen Lepower International Electronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2023cv00981
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heng Wang on behalf of Shenzhen Lepower International Electronics Co., Ltd. (Wang, Heng)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed docket and notes that Attorney Wang failed to file a formal notice of appearance for Shenzhen Lepower as directed in Dkt. No. #15 . To date, Attorney Wang has only appeared for Amazon.com, Inc. Therefore, the court sua sponte extends Attorney Wang's time to file a formal notice of appearance for defendant Shenzhen Lepower to 9/22/2023. Failure to follow Court orders and directives may result in sanctions. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/19/2023. (sg)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS AMAZON.COM, INC. PURSUANT TO FRCP 41: Amazon.com, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/15/2023. (ptm)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER approving stipulation to file amended complaint and extension of answer deadline. Defendant Shenzhen Lepower International Electronics Co., Ltd. answer to Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #13 ) due 11/13/2023. Attorney Wang is directed to submit a formal notice of appearance for Defendant Shenzhen Lepower International Electronics Co., Ltd. By close of business on 9/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/15/2023. (sg, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Amazon.com, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41 by Homesite Insurance Company. (Gallin, Fredric)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shenzhen Lepower International Electronics Co., Ltd. filed by Homesite Insurance Company.(Gallin, Fredric)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION re filing of Amended Complaint by Homesite Insurance Company. (Gallin, Fredric)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed letter request (Dkt. No. #10 ) for an adjournment of the Rule 16 conference and related deadlines. Letter request granted for the reasons stated. The Rule 16 conference and related deadlines are adjourned without new date at this time. However, plaintiff is directed to file the stipulation as referenced in Dkt. No. 10 or a status report regarding same by 10/6/2023. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/5/2023. (jcl)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter Motion from counsel for plaintiff requesting adjournment of conference for Homesite Insurance Company requesting adjournment of Conference of September 12, 2023 submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Gallin, Fredric)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heng Wang on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Wang, Heng)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from this action. Having reviewed this matter more closely, it has come to my attention that I may have a conflict of interest, and therefore I recuse myself from this case. WHEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk enter this Text Order of Recusal for the undersigned; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another United States District Judge. (U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby recused. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks remains the assigned magistrate judge). SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 8/21/2023. (sal)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amazon.com, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc..(Vanacore, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, Civil Case Assignment and Filing Order (Vanacore, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Homesite Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance for Homesite Insurance Company.. (Gallin, Fredric)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Amazon.com, Inc. answer due 8/18/2023. (egr)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/12/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/5/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet (egr)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff(s) in State of New York Supreme Court: County of Oneida. (egr)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York Supreme Court County of Oneida, case number EFCA2023-001764 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6407793) filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesite Insurance Company v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Fredric P. Gallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Vanacore
Represented By: Heng Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Lepower International Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Heng Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?