Flocast, LLC. v. Movi Family, LLC.
Plaintiff: Flocast, LLC.
Defendant: Movi Family, LLC.
Case Number: 6:2023cv01174
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 ReSet Deadlines: Motions to be filed by 11/16/2023. (ban)
November 2, 2023 TEXT Minute Entry for Telephone Pre-motion Conference held on 11/2/2023 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Leo Loughlin, Esq., Jeffrey Lindenbaum, Esq., Michael Battaglia, Esq., and Richard Wydeven, Esq. for the Plaintiff; David Hecht, Esq. and Delphine Knight Brown, Esq. (PHV pending) for the defendant; Judge D'Agostino addresses counsel regarding the pre-motion letter and response. Counsel for the Plaintiff and counsel for the defendant address the Court; The Court will permit the defense to file a motion to dismiss. The Motion should be filed on or before 11/16/23. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino, CRD Britney Norton [Time 11:01 a.m. - 11:15 a.m.]) (ban)
November 2, 2023 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #22 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Delphine W. Knight Brown. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: an updated Petition for Admission form with the Good Standing section fully completed; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
October 31, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Delphine W. Knight Brown Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6497321. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Attorney EFiling Registration Form, #3 Declaration of David L. Hecht, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Hecht, David)
October 26, 2023 Filing 21 Pre-Motion Response to #20 Pre-Motion Letter by Movi Family, LLC. requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Loughlin, Leo)
October 23, 2023 Filing 20 Pre-Motion Letter by Movi Family, LLC. requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 10/26/2023 (Hecht, David)
October 6, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael V. Battaglia on behalf of Flocast, LLC. (Battaglia, Michael)
October 6, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Wydeven on behalf of Flocast, LLC. (Wydeven, Richard)
October 6, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo M. Loughlin on behalf of Flocast, LLC. (Loughlin, Leo)
October 6, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (sg )
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #14 Letter Request for extension of time to respond to the complaint. Movi Family, LLC. answer due 11/6/2023. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/6/2023. (sg)
October 5, 2023 Filing 14 Letter Motion from David L. Hecht for Movi Family, LLC. requesting Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint submitted to Judge Mae A. DAgostino . (Hecht, David)
October 5, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Hecht on behalf of Movi Family, LLC. (Hecht, David)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Wydeven. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/2/2023. (sg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Battaglia. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/2/2023. (sg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leo Loughlin. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/2/2023. (sg)
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Wydeven Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6461234. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Declaration Petition for Admission, #3 Exhibit(s) E-Filing Reg. Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael V. Battaglia Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6461221. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Declaration Petition for Admission, #3 Exhibit(s) E-Filing Reg. Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leo M. Loughlin Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6461206. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Declaration Petition for Admission, #3 Exhibit(s) E-Filing Reg. Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flocast, LLC.. Movi Family, LLC. served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flocast, LLC.. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/14/2023 09:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/7/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Movi Family, LLC. (mgh)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) US D714,072 S. (mgh)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Movi Family, LLC. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6443553) filed by Flocast, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flocast, LLC. v. Movi Family, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flocast, LLC.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Represented By: Leo M. Loughlin
Represented By: Michael V. Battaglia
Represented By: Richard Wydeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movi Family, LLC.
Represented By: David Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?