Evans v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Katherine Evans
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 8:2013cv00447
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Plattsburgh Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. McAvoy
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Second Circuit Mandate, entered June 9, 2016, this matter is hereby Remanded, pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g), to the Commissioner of Social Security in order to evaluate Evan's disability claim consistent with the controlling law identified in the Second Circuit decision, pursuant to 26 Order of Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (hmr)
August 11, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: in favor of Carolyn Colvin against Katherine Evans. It is ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision denying disability benefits is AFFIRMED. (mc)
August 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision denying disability benefits is AFFIRMED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 8/10/2015. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Evans
Represented By: Mark A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?