Labombard v. Winterbottom et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher LaBombard |
Defendant: |
Belinda A. Winterbottom, Laborers' Pension Fund of Local Union No. 186 and Local Union No. 186 |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00071 |
Filed: |
January 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Plattsburgh Office |
County: |
Clinton |
Presiding Judge: |
Mae A. D'Agostino |
Presiding Judge: |
Christian F. Hummel |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 23, 2015 |
Filing
72
DECISION AND ORDER Re 70 Motion for Bill of Costs: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant Laborers' Pension Fund of Local Union No. 186's motion forbill of costs is GRANTED in part for a total of $70.30; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/23/15. (ban)
|
November 5, 2015 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the court shall enter judgment in Defendant s' favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/5/15. (ban)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: The Clerk hereby ORDERS that Defendant Local 186's motion to dismiss is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's request for an exten sion of time to serve Defendant Local 186 is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Local 186's request for attorney's fees and costs i s DENIED without prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Local 186 must move for attorney's fees in accordance with Rule 54(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS after theentry of judgment; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/25/2014. (ban)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?